EP2618880 - CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vital 5, LLC 124 South 600 West, Suite 100 Logan, UT 84321 / US | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Venture MD PO Box 1992 Broomfield, Colorado 80020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALLIN, Thomas, Wade 570 Research Park Way Suite 102 North Logan, Utah 84341 / US | 02 /
MERETTE, Jean-Sebastien 50 Devyn Dr. Chester Springs, Pennsylvania 19425 / US | 03 /
WHITE, Patrick, Michel 24 Hagerty Blvd. Suite 12 West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US | 04 /
PHILLIPS, Frank 881 Kimball Rd. Highland Park, Illinois 60035 / US | 05 /
SINGH, Kern 1725 W. Harrison St. Suite 1063 Chicago, Illinois 60612 / US | 06 /
CHERVITZ, Alan 4084 Arlington Drive Palm Harbor, Florida 34685 / US | 07 /
REEVES, Cary PO Box 1992 Broomfield, Colorado 80020 / US | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Lilliehorn, Tobias Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 60 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11827431.5 | 21.09.2011 | WO2011US52524 | Priority number, date | US20100385309P | 22.09.2010 Original published format: US 385309 P | US201161450089P | 07.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161450089 P | US201161450094P | 07.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161450094 P | US201161450096P | 07.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161450096 P | US201161494805P | 08.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161494805 P | US201161494810P | 08.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161494810 P | US201161494822P | 08.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161494822 P | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012040311 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2618880 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01, A61M19/00 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
A61M19/00 (EP);
A61M25/0021 (EP);
A61M25/0067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | KATHETER | [2013/31] | English: | CATHETER | [2013/31] | French: | CATHÉTER | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 14.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 02.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4643716 (DRACH); | [Y]US2004073194 (OLSEN ET AL.); | [A]US5681274 (PERKINS ET AL.); | [A]JPH09108218 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO., LTD.) |