EP2621573 - MASK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Limited 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORMICA, Justin John c/o ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | 02 /
ROMAGNOLI, Jose Ignacio c/o ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | 03 /
KWOK, Philip Rodney c/o ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | 04 /
GIBSON, Joel Edward c/o ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | 05 /
PIDCOCK, David Anthony c/o ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | 06 /
SKIPPER, Christopher, Scott c/o ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | 07 /
GRAY, Stephen c/o ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | [2016/51] |
Former [2013/32] | 01 /
FORMICA, Justin John c/- ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | ||
02 /
ROMAGNOLI, Jose Ignacio c/- ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | |||
03 /
KWOK, Philip Rodney c/- ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | |||
04 /
GIBSON, Joel Edward c/- ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | |||
05 /
PIDCOCK, David Anthony c/- ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | |||
06 /
SKIPPER, Christopher, Scott c/- ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | |||
07 /
GRAY, Stephen c/- ResMed Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/32] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11827829.0 | 30.09.2011 | [2016/51] | WO2011AU01259 | Priority number, date | US20100388357P | 30.09.2010 Original published format: US 388357 P | US201161443623P | 16.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161443623 P | US201161457981P | 27.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161457981 P | US201161528524P | 29.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161528524 P | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012040792 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621573 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2621573 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
A61M16/0666 (EP,US);
A61M16/06 (US);
A61M16/0057 (US);
A61M16/0611 (EP,US);
A61M16/0616 (EP,US);
A61M16/0622 (EP,US);
A61M16/0683 (EP,US);
A61M16/0816 (US);
A61M16/0825 (EP,US);
A61M16/0875 (US);
A61M16/20 (EP,US);
A61M16/208 (EP,US);
A61M16/0655 (EP);
A61M2202/0225 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0216 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0225, A61M2202/0085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASKENSYSTEM | [2013/32] | English: | MASK SYSTEM | [2013/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MASQUE | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 27.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16205363.1 / EP3231470 | EP23150948.0 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2011 | AL | 21.12.2016 | AT | 21.12.2016 | BE | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | ES | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | IT | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | NL | 21.12.2016 | PL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | TR | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | NO | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
TR | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 21.12.2016 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB190901085 (DENTAL MFG CO LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 2, lines 6-50 * * page 3, lines 1-7 * [I] 15; | [A]US5005571 (DIETZ HENRY G [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]US6123071 (BERTHON-JONES MICHAEL [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,11,13,14 * abstract * * column 4, lines 61-67 * * column 5, line 46 - column 7, line 22 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 15; | [XYI]WO2005063328 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,10-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] , [0060] - [0063] - [0 71] , [0 72] , [0 73] * [Y] 8,9 [I] 15; | [A]WO2007008725 (THORNTON W KEITH [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010066004 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0136] , [ 145] - [0147] *; | [A]US2010199992 (HO PETER CHI FAI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5005571 (DIETZ HENRY G [US]); | [A]US6123071 (BERTHON-JONES MICHAEL [AU], et al); | [A]WO2005063328 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO2007008725 (THORNTON W KEITH [US]) |