EP2622922 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COLLABORATIVE SPECTRUM ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectrum Bridge, Inc. 1064 Greenwood Blvd., Suite 200 Lake Mary, Florida 32746 / US | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSSAIN, Hrishikesh 778 Haddonstone Circle Apt. 204 Heathrow, Florida 32746 / US | 02 /
STANFORTH, Peter 1770 Seneca Boulevard Winter Springs, Florida 32708 / US | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2013/32] | Aurell, Henrik Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 11829807.4 | 28.09.2011 | WO2011US53565 | Priority number, date | US20100894548 | 30.09.2010 Original published format: US 894548 | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012044639 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2622922 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/23, H04B17/318, // H04W16/14, H04W24/08 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04B17/23 (EP,US);
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | H04W72/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR KOLLABORATIVE SPEKTRUMSANALYSE | [2013/32] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COLLABORATIVE SPECTRUM ANALYSIS | [2013/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE SPECTRE COLLABORATIVE | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 03.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009245119 (KUFFNER STEPHEN L [US], et al) [X] 1,10-15 * claims 1-23 * * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0028] , [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * [Y] 2-9; | [Y]US2009310661 (KLOPER DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 2-9 * claims 1-25 * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0075] *; | [AP]WO2011064148 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [AP] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * claims 1-16 * | International search | [X]US2010134699 (GAO WEN [US], et al); | [Y]US7236789 (BALACHANDRAN KRISHNA [US], et al); | [Y]US2005227625 (DIENER NEIL R [US]); | [A]US2008080604 (HUR YOUNGSIK [US], et al) |