EP2621452 - ANTI-FREE-FLOW MECHANISM FOR ENTERAL FEEDING PUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zevex, Inc. 4314 Zevex Park Lane Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | [2016/44] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Zevex, Inc. 4314 Zevex Park Lane Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECK, Kent 825 North 300 West Suite C250 Salt Lake City UT 84103 / US | 02 /
EGGERS, Philip 7704 Timberline Dr. Cottonwood Heights UT 84121 / US | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Bishton, Amy Virginia, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [2016/44] |
Former [2013/32] | Sanger, Phillip Simon Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11829929.6 | 29.09.2011 | [2016/44] | WO2011US54077 | Priority number, date | US20100896729 | 01.10.2010 Original published format: US 896729 | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012044860 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2621452 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2621452 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/20, A61J1/14, A61J1/05, A61M5/142, A61M1/00, A61M39/28, A61M5/168 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP,US);
A61J15/0026 (US);
A61J15/0076 (EP,US);
A61M39/24 (EP,US);
A61M39/28 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0482 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7889 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | A61J1/20, A61J1/14, A61J1/05, A61M5/142, A61M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MECHANISMUS ZUM SCHUTZ VOR FREIEM FLUSS FÜR ENTERALE SPEISEPUMPEN | [2013/32] | English: | ANTI-FREE-FLOW MECHANISM FOR ENTERAL FEEDING PUMPS | [2013/32] | French: | MÉCANISME ANTI-ÉCOULEMENT LIBRE POUR POMPES D'ALIMENTATION ENTÉRALE | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 15.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2011 | AL | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | RS | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.09.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 29.09.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.09.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.09.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CZ | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 02.11.2016 | |
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9805378 (ALARIS MEDICAL SYST INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * figures 5, 6, 8 * * page 9, lines 23-29 *; | [I]US2002169424 (MILES SCOTT [US], et al) [I] 1-3 * figures 1, 5e, 9 *; | [XI]US2003040700 (HICKLE RANDALL S [US], et al) [X] 12 * figures 1, 3 * * paragraph [0002] *[I] 13,14; | [Y]US2004097885 (BECK KENT F [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 82] , [0 83] * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2010082001 (BECK KENT [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * figures 9a-c * | International search | [Y]US6129699 (HAIGHT LEVOY G [US], et al); | [X]US2002169424 (MILES SCOTT [US], et al); | [A]US2004097885 (BECK KENT F [US], et al); | [X]US2010082001 (BECK KENT [US], et al); | [XP]US2011028899 (BECK KENT [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003040700 |