EP2625376 - WELLBORE PACKER BACK-UP RING ASSEMBLY, PACKER AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Packers Plus Energy Services Inc. Bow Valley Square 2 Suite 2200, 205 - 5 Avenue SW Calgary, Alberta T2P 2V7 / CA | [2013/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEMIG, Daniel Jon 256 Woodhaven Place SW Calgary Alberta T2W 5P9 / CA | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Vinsome, Rex Martin Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne, Tyne and Wear NE1 6SU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11830165.4 | 06.10.2011 | WO2011CA01152 | Priority number, date | US20100390568P | 06.10.2010 Original published format: US 390568 P | [2013/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012045168 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2625376 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 12.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/129, E21B33/128, E21B33/12 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
E21B33/1216 (EP,US);
E21B33/1293 (US);
E21B23/06 (US);
E21B33/128 (EP,US);
E21B33/129 (EP,US);
E21B33/1292 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/33] | E21B33/129, E21B23/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Extension states | BA | 02.05.2013 | ME | 02.05.2013 | Title | German: | RINGANORDNUNG ZUR SICHERUNG EINES BOHRLOCHPACKERS SOWIE BOHRLOCHPACKER UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/33] | English: | WELLBORE PACKER BACK-UP RING ASSEMBLY, PACKER AND METHOD | [2013/33] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE BAGUE ANTIEXTRUSION POUR UNE GARNITURE POUR UN PUITS DE FORAGE, GARNITURE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 19.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3035639 (BROWN CICERO C, et al) [X] 1,8,10,12,14,15,17,18 * column 1, line 72 - column 2, line 48 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US3371716 (CURRENT JAMES H) [X] 1,4,7,8,10-15,17,18 * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 18 * [Y] 2,3,16; | [A]GB2091318 (BROWN OIL TOOLS) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]US4611658 (SALERNI JOHN V [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US5014782 (DASPIT RONALD A [US]) [X] 12-15,17-19 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 48 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5839515 (YUAN YUSHENG [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 38 - line 54; figure - *; | [Y]US6056052 (MULLEN BRYON D [US], et al) [Y] 16 * column 6, line 1 - line 11 *; | [A]US2002070503 (ZIMMERMAN PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005189121 (DOANE JAMES C [US], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1753936 (PETROWELL LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4,8-12,14,15,17-19 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] *; | [X]US2008093086 (COURVILLE PERRY W [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,12,14,15,17,18 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO2010059591 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8-10,12-15,17-19 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 7-9 * | International search | [A]US3109493 (CARTER THOMAS J); | [A]US4288082 (SETTERBERG JR JOHN R); | [A]US5176217 (LUKE MIKE A [US], et al); | [A]EP1197632 (GREENE TWEED INC [US]); | [A]WO0246573 (WEATHERFORD LAMB [US], et al); | [A]US6666276 (YOKLEY JOHN M [US], et al) |