EP2627930 - FRICTION DRIVING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liniax ApS Ørstedsvej 11 8600 Silkeborg / DK | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLRIK, Henrik-Gerner Bakkegardsvej 413 3050 Humlebaek / DK | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Nordic Patent Service A/S Højbro Plads 10 1200 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 11832164.5 | 03.10.2011 | WO2011DK00110 | Priority number, date | DK20100000925 | 12.10.2010 Original published format: DK 201000925 | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012048709 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2627930 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16H19/02 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
F16H19/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Title | German: | REIBUNGSANTRIEBSMECHANISMUS | [2013/34] | English: | FRICTION DRIVING MECHANISM | [2013/34] | French: | MÉCANISME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À FRICTION | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 12.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 11.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3589202 (STANLEY RICHARD B) [I] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * * figure 12 * * column 8, lines 38-59; figure 15 *; | [I]FR2528142 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [I] 1,4 * figures 8,10 *; | [A]JPH08285027 (NIPPON BEARING KK) [A] 1-8* abstract * | International search | [X]SU449191 (KOSTENKO A1); | [A]US2820367 (FRANTZ CHARLES E, et al); | [A]DE3002936 (HACKEWITZ FRIEDRICH WILHELM VO); | [A]EP0095891 (RHP GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]US3046801 (PRAVEL HERMAN E); | [A]GB2171169 (RHP GROUP PLC); | [A]US3443443 (SPENCE THOMAS E); | [A]US6081050 (HONG YEH SUN [KR], et al) |