EP2628709 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PHOSPHORUS PENTAFLUORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Atsushi c/o Yodogawa Seisakusho DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0044 / JP | 02 /
TAKUBO, Seiji c/o Yodogawa Seisakusho DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0044 / JP | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11832548.9 | 12.10.2011 | WO2011JP73395 | Priority number, date | JP20100231285 | 14.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010231285 | [2013/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012050113 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2628709 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/10, C01B25/455, C01D15/00 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
C01B25/10 (EP,KR,US);
C01B25/455 (KR);
H01M4/582 (US);
C01D15/005 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/34] | C01B25/10, C01B25/455 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHOSPHORPENTAFLUORID | [2013/34] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PHOSPHORUS PENTAFLUORIDE | [2013/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PENTAFLUORURE DE PHOSPHORE | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2013 | Translation filed | 11.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 19.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11171517 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * examples 1-5 *; | [A]EP0846657 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US6645451 (SCHULZ ALF [DE], et al) [X] 8 * examples 5-6 *; | [X]EP0816288 (SOLVAY FLUOR & DERIVATE [DE]) [X] 8 * example 4 *; | [A]DE19722269 (SOLVAY FLUOR & DERIVATE [DE]) [A] 6 * example all *; | [A]US2933375 (CLARK BRINKER KEITH) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH11171517 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10245211 (ATOCHEM ELF SA); | [Y]JPH1053406 (SOLVAY FLUOR & DERIVATE GMBH); | [Y]JPH1081505 (SOLVAY FLUOR & DERIVATE GMBH) | by applicant | JPS6472901 | - J. INORG. NUCL. CHEM., (1960), vol. 16, pages 52 - 59 | - ANN. CHIM. PHYS., (1891), vol. 24, pages 224 - 282 | - J. CHEM. SOC. PART 4, (1963), page 4408 |