EP2628069 - APPARATUS FOR SENSING UTILIZING TILES, SENSOR HAVING A SET OF PLATES, OBJECT IDENTIFICATION FOR MULTI-TOUCH SURFACES, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New York University 550 First Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | For all designated states Tactonic Technologies, LLC 210 W. 70th Street, Apt. 705 New York, NY 10023-4305 / US | [2020/26] |
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states New York University 650 First Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | ||
For all designated states Tactonic Technologies, LLC 210 W. 70th Street, Apt. 705 New York, NY 10023-4305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERLIN, Kenneth 7-13 Washington Square North Apt. 31B New York, NY 10003 / US | 02 /
HENDEE, Charles 370 Adelphi Street, 1 Brookyn, NY 11238 / US | 03 /
GRAU, Alex 30-40 37th Street Basement Apartment Astoria, NY 11103 / US | 04 /
SEIDMAN, Gerald 210 W. 70th Street, Apt. 705 New York, NY 10023 / US | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2013/34] | Rees, Simon John Lewis Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11832868.1 | 11.10.2011 | [2020/49] | WO2011US01739 | Priority number, date | US201161572938P | 25.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161572938 P | US20100404897P | 12.10.2010 Original published format: US 404897 P | US201161462789P | 08.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161462789 P | US201161572642P | 19.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161572642 P | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012050606 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2628069 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2628069 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/045 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/04166 (EP,US);
G06F3/005 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (US);
G06F3/0304 (US);
G06F3/04144 (EP,US);
G06F3/045 (EP,US);
G06F3/047 (US);
G06F2203/04101 (US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04104 (US);
G06F2203/04105 (US);
G06F2203/04106 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/34] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER VERWENDUNG VON FLIESEN, SENSOR MIT EINEM PLATTENSATZ, OBJEKTIDENTIFIKATION FÜR MEHRFACHBERÜHRUNGSFLÄCHEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/34] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SENSING UTILIZING TILES, SENSOR HAVING A SET OF PLATES, OBJECT IDENTIFICATION FOR MULTI-TOUCH SURFACES, AND METHOD | [2013/34] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION UTILISANT DES TUILES, CAPTEUR COMPRENANT UN ENSEMBLE DE PLAQUES, IDENTIFICATION D'OBJET POUR SURFACES TACTILES MULTIPOINTS ET PROCÉDÉ | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 03.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2019 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2011 | AL | 02.12.2020 | AT | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | CZ | 02.12.2020 | DK | 02.12.2020 | EE | 02.12.2020 | ES | 02.12.2020 | FI | 02.12.2020 | HR | 02.12.2020 | IT | 02.12.2020 | LT | 02.12.2020 | LV | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | NL | 02.12.2020 | PL | 02.12.2020 | RO | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SE | 02.12.2020 | SI | 02.12.2020 | SK | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | BG | 02.03.2021 | NO | 02.03.2021 | GR | 03.03.2021 | IS | 02.04.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 11.10.2011 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0175923 (ELECTROTEXTILES CO LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [X]US2005057515 (BATHICHE STEVEN N [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0046] *; | [X]US2010090299 (CHANG WEN-YANG [TW], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0036] *; | [X]US2010103121 (KIM EOK-SU [KR], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]US2010253626 (KIM JONG-HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034] * | International search | [A]US5440237 (BROWN DANIEL R [US], et al); | [Y]US5986221 (STANLEY JAMES G [US]); | [Y]US2002180710 (ROBERTS JERRY B [US]); | [Y]US2004109005 (WITT SARAH ELIZABETH [GB], et al); | [Y]US2006186307 (PLETNER BARUCH [US], et al); | [A]US2008180399 (CHENG TUNG WAN [HK]); | [X]US2009256817 (PERLIN KENNETH [US], et al); | [A]US2010117988 (JACOBS ADRIAN MARC SIMON [GB], et al) | Examination | US9411457 | by applicant | US2008122796 | US2010090299 | US7782307 | - A. WUM. SHAHN. LOBO, A Virtual 3D Blackboard: 3D Finger Tracking using a Single Camera, (20000000), pages 536 - 543 | - C. JENNINGS, "Robust Finger Tracking with Multiple Camera", Proc. of the International Workshop on Recognition, Analysis, and Tracking of Faces and Gestures in Real-Time Systems, (19990000), doi:10.1109/RATFG.1999.799238, pages 152 - 160, XP010356542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RATFG.1999.799238 | - J. Y. HAN, "Low-cost multi-touch sensing through frustrated total internal reflection", Proceedings of the 18th Annual ACM Symposium on User Interface Software and Technology, (20050000), pages 115 - 118, XP002598826 | - "The unmousepad: an interpolating multi-touch force-sensing input pad", I. ROSENBERGK. PERLIN, SIGGRAPH '09: ACM SIGGRAPH 2009 papers, ACM, (20090000), pages 1 - 9 | - XIA H.TUCKER P.G., "Distance solutions for medial axis transform", Proceedings of 18th International Meshing Roundtable, Salt Lake City, Utah, (20090000), pages 247 - 260 | - R. HARTLEYA. ZISSERMAN, Multiple View Geometry in Computer Vision, Cambridge University Press, (20000000), pages 138 - 183 | - O. FAUGERAS, Three-Dimensional Computer Vision: A Geometric Approach, MIT Press, (19960000), pages 33 - 68 | - R. Y. TSAI, "A Versatile Camera Calibration Technique for 3D Machine Vision", IEEE J. Robotics & Automation, (19870800), vol. RA-3, no. 4, doi:10.1109/JRA.1987.1087109, pages 323 - 344, XP002633633 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JRA.1987.1087109 | - FARSHID ARMAN, "Model-based object recognition in dense-range images-a review", Journal ACM Computing Surveys (CSUR) Surveys, (19930300), vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1145/151254.151255, XP058297767 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/151254.151255 | - G. QIANJ. ZHANGA. KIDANE, "People Identification Using Gait via Floor Pressure Analysis", IEEE Sensors Journal, (20100900), vol. 10, no. 9, pages 1447 - 1460 | - AUGSTEN, T.KAEFER, K.MEUSEL, R.FETZER, C.KANITZ, D.STOFF., T.BECKER, T.HOLZ, C.BAUDISCH, P., "Multitoe: High-Precision Interaction with Back-Projected Floors Based on High-Resolution Multi-Touch Input", Proceedings of UIST 2010, New York, NY, (20101003), pages 209 - 218 | - JACOB O. WOBBROCKMEREDITH RINGEL MORRISANDREW D. WILSON, "User-Defined Gestures for Surface Computing", Proceeding CHI '09 Proceedings of the 27th international conference on Human factors in computing systems |