EP2621282 - GABA AGONISTS IN THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS ASSOCIATED WITH METABOLIC SYNDROME AND GABA COMBINATIONS IN TREATMENT OR PROPHYLAXIS OF TYPE I DIABETES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2020/16] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUFMAN, Daniel 3543 Greenfield Avenue Los Angeles California 90034 / US | 02 /
TIAN, Jide 3618 Keystone Los Angeles California 90034 / US | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2020/16] |
Former [2013/32] | Mistry, Meeta, et al Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, BS27 3AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11833060.4 | 28.09.2011 | [2020/16] | WO2011US53732 | Priority number, date | US201161433089P | 14.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161433089 P | US20100387398P | 28.09.2010 Original published format: US 387398 P | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012050907 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2621282 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2621282 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/00, A61K31/66, A01N37/00, A61K31/19, A61K31/197, A61K31/4465, A61K38/20, A61K39/00, A61K39/39, A61K45/06, A61P3/08, A61P3/10 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/197 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4465 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K39/0008 (US);
A61K39/39 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/197, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP,US);
A61K31/4465, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/32] | A01N57/00, A61K31/66, A01N37/00, A61K31/19 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GABA-AGONISTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DEM STOFFWECHSELSYNDROM UND GABA-KOMBINATIONEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PROPHYLAXE VON DIABETES VOM TYP I | [2013/32] | English: | GABA AGONISTS IN THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS ASSOCIATED WITH METABOLIC SYNDROME AND GABA COMBINATIONS IN TREATMENT OR PROPHYLAXIS OF TYPE I DIABETES | [2013/32] | French: | AGONISTES DE GABA DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES ASSOCIÉS AU SYNDROME MÉTABOLIQUE ET COMBINAISONS DE GABA DANS LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PROPHYLAXIE DU DIABÈTE DE TYPE I | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 10.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20168280.4 / EP3753410 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2011 | AL | 15.04.2020 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | IT | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | RS | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | IE | 28.09.2020 | LU | 28.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.09.2011 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 28.09.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008255093 (TAM PETER Y [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-11 * columns 1, 4-11; claim - *; | [XY]JP2009298742 (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 4-11; | [XI]US2010166675 (WANG QINGHUA [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,11 * figure 6 * [I] 6,10; | [I] - KAZAMA T ET AL, "Oral administration of GABA and phytosteryl ferulates prevent decreasing stressed mouse plasma adiponectin levels", FEBS JOURNAL, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, LONDON, GB, (20100601), vol. 277, no. Suppl.1, ISSN 1742-464X, pages 70 - 71, XP009177205 [I] 1,4-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - UCHIDA A ET AL, "Effect of rice germ on plasma adiponectin level in C57BL/6j mice", FEBS JOURNAL, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, LONDON, GB, (20080628), vol. 275, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 1742-464X, page 434, XP009177219 [Y] 1,4-11 * abstract * | [Y] - HIROMI HAGIWARA ET AL, "The Effect of Pre-germinated Brown Rice Intake on Blood Glucose and PAI-1 Levels in Streptozotocin-induced Diabetic Rats", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (20040101), vol. 68, no. 2, doi:10.1271/bbb.68.444, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 444 - 447, XP055110528 [Y] 1,4-11 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.68.444 | [Y] - Claudio Blasi, "INFLUENCE OF BEN2lODIAZEPINES ON BODY WEIGHT AND FOOD INTAKE II'4 OBESE AND LEAN ZUCKER RATS", (20000101), pages 561 - 577, URL: http://ac.els-cdn.com/S0278584600000932/1-s2.0-S0278584600000932-main.pdf?_tid=1045a8fc-b5bf-11e3-98f4-00000aacb361&acdnat=1395931976_46e876f26166e11c8414a29a50f0be01, (20140327), XP055110410 [Y] 1,4-11 * page 570 * | [Y] - SQUADRITO ET AL, "Evidence that a gabaergic mechanism influences the development of obesity in obese zucker rats", PHARMACOLOGICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ITALIAN PHARMACOLOGICAL SOCIETY, IT, (19881201), vol. 20, no. 12, doi:10.1016/S0031-6989(88)80739-2, ISSN 0031-6989, pages 1087 - 1088, XP022220292 [Y] 1,4-11 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-6989(88)80739-2 | [Y] - TEWS ET AL, "Dietary GABA decreases body weight of genetically obese mice", LIFE SCIENCES, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 29, no. 24, doi:10.1016/0024-3205(81)90709-8, ISSN 0024-3205, (19811214), pages 2535 - 2542, (19811214), XP023734614 [Y] 1,4-11 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0024-3205(81)90709-8 | [IP] - KAZUYUKI OHARA ET AL, "Oral administration of -aminobutyric acid and -oryzanol prevents stress-induced hypoadiponectinemia", PHYTOMEDICINE, vol. 18, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.PHYMED.2011.01.003, ISSN 0944-7113, (20110615), pages 655 - 660, (20110112), XP028227260 [IP] 1,4-11 * page 659, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phymed.2011.01.003 | [Y] - SAELY ET AL, "Low serum adiponectin is independently associated with both the metabolic syndrome and angiographically determined coronary atherosclerosis", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070704), vol. 383, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.CCA.2007.04.029, ISSN 0009-8981, pages 97 - 102, XP022142309 [Y] 1,4-11 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cca.2007.04.029 | [Y] - SRIDEVI DEVARAJ ET AL, "CRP and Adiponectin and Its Oligomers in the Metabolic Syndrome: Evaluation of New Laboratory-Based Biomarkers", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, (20080415), vol. 129, no. 5, doi:10.1309/RN84K51B2JJY1Y0B, ISSN 0002-9173, pages 815 - 822, XP055110824 [Y] 1,4-11 * page 815, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1309/RN84K51B2JJY1Y0B | International search | [X]US2003162754 (LIGON BROOKE [US]); | [A]US2003170239 (HERING BERNHARD J [US], et al); | [Y]US2007128298 (COWLEY MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [X]US2010197789 (ARIMA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A] - XU ET AL., "Intra-islet insulin suppresses glucagon release via GABA-GABAA receptor system", CELL METABOLISM, (200601), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 47 - 58, XP055110417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cmet.2005.11.015 | Examination | - Jide Tian ET AL, "Oral Treatment with [gamma]-Aminobutyric Acid Improves Glucose Tolerance and Insulin Sensitivity by Inhibiting Inflammation in High Fat Diet-Fed Mice", PLoS ONE, (20110922), vol. 6, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0025338, page e25338, XP055244608 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0025338 | - DAVID A SASS ET AL, "Nonalcoholic Fatty Liver Disease: A Clinical Review", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20050101), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10620-005-1267-Z, ISSN 1573-2568, pages 171 - 180, XP019237111 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10620-005-1267-z |