EP2627397 - COMBINED IRRIGATION AND RINSING TUBE SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.08.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medivators Inc. 14605 28th Avenue North Minneapolis, MN 55447 / US | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENDELE, Travis, Henry 1526 N. Thompson Street Conroe, TX 77301 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Christopher, Steven 627 Pine View Circle Montgomery, TX 77356 / US | 03 /
GRUDO, Dina 1312 Ballantrae Allen, TX 75013 / US | 04 /
BYRNE, Don 6100 Spring Branch Road Montgomery, TX 77316 / US | 05 /
SMITH, Leon, Russ 111 Broken Bough Lane Conroe, TX 77301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | 01 /
BENDELE, Travis, Henry 1526 N. Thompson Street Conroe TX 77301 / US | ||
02 /
ADAMS, Christopher, Steven 627 Pine View Circle Montgomery TX 77356 / US | |||
03 /
GRUDO, Dina 1312 Ballantrae Allen TX 75013 / US | |||
04 /
BYRNE, Don 6100 Spring Branch Road Montgomery TX 77316 / US | |||
05 /
SMITH, Leon, Russ 111 Broken Bough Lane Conroe TX 77301 / US | Representative(s) | Huygens, Arthur Victor Octrooibureau Huygens P.O. Box 86 3400 AB IJsselstein / NL | [2013/34] | Application number, filing date | 11833420.0 | 13.10.2011 | WO2011US56176 | Priority number, date | US20100393238P | 14.10.2010 Original published format: US 393238 P | US201113164766 | 20.06.2011 Original published format: US201113164766 | WO2011US41133 | 20.06.2011 Original published format: PCT/US2011/041133 | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012051432 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2627397 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/015, B65D41/04, B65D47/36 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
A61B1/015 (EP,US);
A61B1/00119 (EP,US);
A61B1/00128 (EP,US);
A61B1/00137 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/34] | A61M39/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHANORDNUNG FÜR KOMBINIERTES BEWÄSSERN UND SPÜLEN | [2013/34] | English: | COMBINED IRRIGATION AND RINSING TUBE SET | [2013/34] | French: | JEU DE TUBES DE RINÇAGE ET D'IRRIGATION COMBINÉS | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 15.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2020 | Observations by third parties | 03.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2023 | Observations by third parties | 19.04.2023 | Observations by third parties | 08.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2023 | Observations by third parties | 01.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5437654 (MCVAY WILLIAM P [US]); | [Y]US6390315 (GIDDINGS SHERRIE L [CA], et al); | [A]US2002092858 (BOWMAN RONALD L [US]); | [XI]JP2004242877 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [XYI]JP2006167064 (PENTAX CORP); | [Y]US2009101562 (NEWTON BRIAN [US]); | [XI]JP2010207362 (HOYA CORP) | International search | [X]US5437654 (MCVAY WILLIAM P [US]); | [Y]US6142979 (MCNALLY DAVID J [US], et al); | [Y]US2002092858 (BOWMAN RONALD L [US]); | [Y]US2003029876 (GIRAUD JEAN-PIERRE [FR]); | [Y]US2003073971 (SAKER GORDON MARK [US]); | [Y]US7066902 (OTT DOUGLAS E [US], et al); | [X]US2007238929 (AIZENFELD AMRAM [IL], et al) | other | EP0082950 | DE4437981 | JPH0753149B | US5437654 | JPH08106052 | US6485412 | JP2006094758 | US2010022834 | EP0082950 | US5328478 | US5536254 | US2002092858 | US2007238929 | US2009101562 | US2009264706 | EP2627397 | CH303625 |