EP2631649 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE RAPID DIAGNOSIS OF DISEASES IN FAECAL SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Certest Biotec, S.L. C/ Maria de Luna 11. Nave 16. 50018 Zaragoza / ES | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENZOR ASÍN, Carlos María De Luna 11 Nave 16 CEEI Aragón E-50018 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
LANDETA ELORZ, Oscar María De Luna 11 Nave 16 CEEI Aragón E-50018 Zaragoza / ES | 03 /
VELASCO MICHELENA, Beatriz María De Luna 11 Nave 16 CEEI Aragón E-50018 Zaragoza / ES | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 11833896.1 | 17.10.2011 | WO2011ES70714 | Priority number, date | ES201031537P | 19.10.2010 Original published format: ES 201031537 P | [2013/35] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012052586 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | ES | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2631649 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2631649 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 26.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, A61B10/00, G01N33/558 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N33/53 (ES);
G01N33/57419 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (EP);
A61B10/0038 (EP);
G01N2800/065 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHNELLEN DIAGNOSE VON KRANKHEITEN IN FÄKALPROBEN | [2013/35] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE RAPID DIAGNOSIS OF DISEASES IN FAECAL SAMPLES | [2013/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC RAPIDE DE MALADIES DANS DES ÉCHANTILLONS FÉCAUX | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2013 | Translation filed | 16.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 12.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004251851 (JAPAN CLINICAL LAB INC) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018]; example 1; claims 1-5 *; | [Y] - OTTEN CHARLOTTE M T ET AL, "Diagnostic performance of rapid tests for detection of fecal calprotectin and lactoferrin and their ability to discriminate inflammatory from irritable bowel syndrome.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY AND LABORATORY MEDICINE : CCLM / FESCC 2008, (2008), vol. 46, no. 9, ISSN 1434-6621, pages 1275 - 1280, XP002726648 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1276, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 2; tables 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/CCLM.2008.246 | [Y] - MEUCCI G ET AL, "Diagnostic value of faecal calprotectin in unselected outpatients referred for colonoscopy: A multicenter prospective study", DIGESTIVE AND LIVER DISEASE, W.B. SAUNDERS, GB, vol. 42, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.DLD.2009.07.002, ISSN 1590-8658, (20100301), pages 191 - 195, (20090819), XP026901156 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dld.2009.07.002 | [A] - VIEIRA ANDREA ET AL, "Inflammatory bowel disease activity assessed by fecal calprotectin and lactoferrin: correlation with laboratory parameters, clinical, endoscopic and histological indexes", BMC RESEARCH NOTES, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, GB, (20091029), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-0500-2-221, ISSN 1756-0500, page 221, XP021064881 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-0500-2-221 | [XP] - "Rapid-TEST Calprotectin-Lactoferrin Card", (20110328), URL: http://diagnosticacitogenetica.listarfish.it/schedetecniche/1301299035-VID-ODZ-270.pdf, (20140704), XP055126878 [XP] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP0884594 (TORELLI GIORGIO [IT]); | [A]WO0136975 (BINAX INC [US]); | [A]US2009104630 (REITER PAUL C [US]); | [A] - VIEIRA A. ET AL., "Inflammatory bowel disease activity assessed by fecal calprotectin and lactoferrin: correlation with laboratory parameters, clinical endoscopic and histological indexes.", BMC RESEARCH NOTES, (2009), vol. 2, no. 221, pages 1 - 7, XP021064881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-0500-2-221 | [A] - SIPPONEN T. ET AL., "Fecal Calprotectin, Lactoferrin, and Endoscopic Disease Activity in Monitoring Anti-TNF-alpha Therapy for Crohn's Disease.", INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASES, (2008), vol. 14, no. 10, pages 1392 - 1398, XP055087971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ibd.20490 | by applicant | EP0641441 | US5455160 | US5552292 | EP1248112 | US6727073 | US7192724 | WO2009065551 | US7560240 | - TURKAY, C.; KASAPOGLU, B., CLINICS, (2010), vol. 65, no. 2, pages 221 - 31 | - VIERIA, A. ET AL., BMC RESEARCH NOTES, (2009), vol. 2, page 221 | - GISBERT, J. ET AL., INFLAMM. BOWEL DIS., (2009), vol. 15, pages 1190 - 1198 | - CHOI, S.W. ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1996), pages 928 - 932 | - SHASTRI, Y.M. ET AL., AM. J. MED., (2008), vol. 121, no. 12, pages 1099 - 106 | - K6HLER G; MILSTEIN C, "Continuous cultures of fused cells secreting antibody of predefined specificity", NATURE, (19750807), vol. 256, no. 5517, pages 495 - 7, XP002024548 |