EP2634563 - SORTER AND SORTING METHOD FOR SEPARATING CELLS AND PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Wellsens Biotech Co., Ltd. Room 1201 Wenjin International Apartment Chengfu Road Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Wei Room 1201 Wenjin International Apartment Chengfu Road Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 02 /
LI, Mengqiu Room 1201 Wenjin International Apartment Chengfu Road Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Dayi Room 1201 Wenjin International Apartment Chengfu Road Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Szabo, Zsolt Danubia Patent & Law Office LLC Bajcsy-Zsilinszky út 16 1051 Budapest / HU | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Szabo, Zsolt Danubia Patent & Law Office LLC Bajcsy-Zsilinszky út 16 1051 Budapest / HU | Application number, filing date | 11835577.5 | 15.09.2011 | WO2011CN79656 | Priority number, date | CN20101526320 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: CN201010526320 | [2013/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012055304 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2634563 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/65 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
G01N21/65 (EP,US);
B01L3/502761 (EP,US);
G01N1/38 (EP,US);
G01N15/1459 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0636 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0652 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0415 (EP,US);
B01L2400/043 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
G01N15/149 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | SORTIERER UND SORTIERVERFAHREN ZUM TRENNEN VON ZELLEN UND PARTIKELN | [2013/36] | English: | SORTER AND SORTING METHOD FOR SEPARATING CELLS AND PARTICLES | [2013/36] | French: | TRIEUSE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRI POUR SÉPARER DES CELLULES ET DES PARTICULES | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2013 | Translation filed | 16.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 10.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CN1842368 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]); | [A]CN1922486 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [A]JP2007532874 (BECKMAN COULTER INC); | [A]CN101297189 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [XP]CN102019277 (BEIJING WEIXINYU BIO TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |