EP2633996 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING INKJET PRINTING POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peking University Founder Group Co., Ltd 5 Floor, Zhongguancun Founder Building No. 298 Chengfu Road Haidian District Beijing 100871 / CN | For all designated states Peking University No. 5. Yiheyuan Road Haidan District Beijing 100871 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Founder Electronics Co., Ltd. Founder Building No. 9, Shangdiwu Street Haidian District, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhenhua Founder Building No. 9 Shangdiwu Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Zhihong Founder Building No. 9 Shangdiwu Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 3, impasse de la Vigie CS 71840 35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/36] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11835638.5 | 27.10.2011 | [2015/43] | WO2011CN81411 | Priority number, date | CN201010531979 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: CN201010531979 | [2013/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012055365 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633996 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2633996 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/01, B41J11/00, B41J29/52, B41J29/44, B41J2/045 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
B41J11/008 (EP,US);
B41J2/04501 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | B41J2/01, B41J11/00, B41J29/52, B41J29/44 | ||
Former IPC [2013/36] | B41J2/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKPOSITION | [2013/36] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING INKJET PRINTING POSITION | [2013/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE POSITION D'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2013 | Translation filed | 16.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 22.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2011 | AL | 21.10.2015 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | MT | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | IE | 27.10.2015 | LU | 27.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.10.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 27.10.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 27.10.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0373558 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]JP2004142199 (CANON KK) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]JP2005246123 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US2008231648 (TABATA KUNIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * | International search | [A]JP2003063078 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2003334979 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC); | [A]JP2004142199 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2005246123 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |