EP2635045 - HEARING AID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGI, Yoshiaki Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Gempo Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11835792.0 | 17.10.2011 | WO2011JP05784 | Priority number, date | JP20110130877 | 13.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011130877 | JP20100239247 | 26.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010239247 | [2013/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012056645 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2635045 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
H04R25/353 (EP,US);
H04R25/552 (EP,US);
H04R2225/43 (EP,US);
H04R2225/61 (EP,US);
H04R2430/03 (EP,US);
H04R25/554 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | HÖRGERÄT | [2013/36] | English: | HEARING AID DEVICE | [2013/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2012 | Translation filed | 27.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 03.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005268964 (INTELLIGENT COSMOS RES INST); | [A]JP2006087018 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH06245299 (SONY CORP) |