EP2587517 - ELECTRON LENS AND THE ELECTRON BEAM DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Param Corporation 3-6-1, Azuma-cho Akishima-shi, Tokyo 196-0033 / JP | [2015/37] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Param Corporation Industry Support Square Tama 302 3-6-1 Azuma-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-0033 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUDA Hiroshi c/o Param Corporation Industry Support Square Tama 302 3-6-1 Azuma-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-0033 / JP | [2015/37] |
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
YASUDA Hiroshi c/o Param Corporation Industry Support Square TAMA 302 3-6-1 Azuma-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-0033 / JP | Representative(s) | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder Paseo de la Castellana 93, 5 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder Paseo de la Castellana 93 28046 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2013/18] | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 120 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 11836299.5 | 25.10.2011 | [2015/37] | WO2011JP74588 | Priority number, date | JP20100240408 | 27.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010240408 | [2013/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012057166 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587517 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2587517 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/143, H01J37/141, H01J37/305, H01L21/027, H01J37/317 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/143 (EP,KR,US);
H01J3/24 (KR,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01J3/20 (KR,US);
H01J37/1416 (KR);
H01J37/3007 (KR,US);
H01J37/3056 (KR);
H01J37/3174 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/3177 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0273 (KR);
H01J2237/002 (EP,US);
H01J2237/1405 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | H01J37/143, H01J37/141, H01J37/305, H01L21/027 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONENOBJEKTIV UND ELEKTRONENSTRAHLVORRICHTUNG | [2013/18] | English: | ELECTRON LENS AND THE ELECTRON BEAM DEVICE | [2013/18] | French: | LENTILLE À ÉLECTRONS ET DISPOSITIF DE FAISCEAU ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2013 | Translation filed | 22.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 04.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2011 | AL | 09.09.2015 | AT | 09.09.2015 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | ES | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | IT | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | MT | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | RS | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | SM | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | IE | 25.10.2015 | LU | 25.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 09.11.2015 | GB | 09.12.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
LU | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
LU | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
BG | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MT | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
SM | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 09.11.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 09.11.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 09.11.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RS | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS60245132 (TOSHIBA KK) [Y] 1,5* abstract *; | [Y]JPH05128986 (JEOL LTD) [Y] 1,5 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1970935 (INTEGRATED CIRCUIT TESTING [DE]) [Y] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figures 1-6 *; | [YA]WO2009157054 (ADVANTEST CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,5,6 * figures 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9 * [A] 2-4; | [YP]EP2302664 (ADVANTEST CORP [JP]) [YP] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0074]; figures 4,5,6,7,8,9 * | International search | [A]JPS63244546 (SEIKO INSTR & ELECTRONICS); | [A]WO2009157054 (ADVANTEST CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2007311117 |