EP2633400 - STATEFUL APPLICATIONS OPERATING IN A STATELESS CLOUD COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSON, Neil A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
REIERSON, Kristofer H. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
MONTGOMERY, Andrew c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/28] |
Former [2013/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11836820.8 | 27.09.2011 | [2022/28] | WO2011US53531 | Priority number, date | US20100912798 | 27.10.2010 Original published format: US 912798 | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012057955 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633400 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2633400 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/455 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G06F9/45533 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/28] | G06F9/44, G06F15/16, G06F12/08, // G06F9/455 | ||
Former IPC [2013/36] | G06F9/44, G06F15/16, G06F12/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSTANDSORIENTIERTE ANWENDUNGEN BETRIEBEN IN EINER ZUSTANDSLOSEN CLOUD-COMPUTING UMGEBUNG | [2022/10] | English: | STATEFUL APPLICATIONS OPERATING IN A STATELESS CLOUD COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT | [2013/36] | French: | APPLICATIONS À ÉTATS FONCTIONNANT DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT D'INFONUAGIQUE SANS ÉTATS | [2013/36] |
Former [2013/36] | IN EINER ZUSTANDSLOSEN CLOUD-COMPUTING-UMGEBUNG BETRIEBENE ZUSTANDSORIENTIERTE ANWENDUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 02.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2011 | AL | 13.07.2022 | AT | 13.07.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | CY | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | ES | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | IT | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | MK | 13.07.2022 | MT | 13.07.2022 | NL | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | TR | 13.07.2022 | IE | 27.09.2022 | LU | 27.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
TR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
TR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
MK | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CY | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.09.2011 | |
AL | 13.07.2022 | ||
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
IT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
IE | 27.09.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
LU | 27.09.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 13.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009043029 (XCERION AB [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 23, lines 17-24 ** page 45, line 27 - page 46, line 12; figure 10c * | International search | [Y]US2009300149 (FERRIS JAMES MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2010115490 (WILCOCK LAWRENCE [GB], et al); | [A]US2010198788 (SIM-TANG SIEW YONG [US]); | [Y]WO2010110788 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) | Examination | - CONSTANTINE P SAPUNTZAKIS ET AL, "Optimizing the migration of virtual computers", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20021231), vol. 36, no. SI, doi:10.1145/844128.844163, ISSN 0163-5980, pages 377 - 390, XP058141987 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/844128.844163 | by applicant | WO2009043029 | US2009300149 | US2010115490 | US2010198788 | WO2010110788 |