EP2632064 - METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR FREQUENCY OFFSET DETECTION OF TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/24] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Hongwei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Xianxiao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Lord, Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 11837561.7 | 31.10.2011 | WO2011CN81583 | Priority number, date | CN201010532088 | 01.11.2010 Original published format: CN201010532088 | [2013/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012059035 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | ZH | [2012/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2632064 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2632064 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, H04L25/03, H04L27/00, H04L27/20, H04L27/227, H04L27/22 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
H04L25/03866 (EP);
H04L27/0014 (EP);
H04L27/2089 (EP);
H04L27/22 (EP);
H04L27/2271 (EP);
H04L2027/0065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | H04B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG DES FREQUENZVERSATZES EINES ENDGERÄTS | [2013/35] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR FREQUENCY OFFSET DETECTION OF TERMINAL | [2013/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE DÉCALAGE DE FRÉQUENCE D'UN TERMINAL | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2013 | Translation filed | 24.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 02.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2011 | AL | 10.06.2015 | AT | 10.06.2015 | BE | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | IT | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MK | 10.06.2015 | MT | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | RS | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | SM | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | GB | 31.10.2015 | IE | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | LU | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
GB | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
GB | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
GB | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
GB | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
GB | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
GB | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - RAIMUND MEYER ET AL, "Efficient receivers for GSM MUROS downlink transmission", IEEE 20TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS (PIMRC 2009), IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090913), ISBN 978-1-4244-5122-7, pages 2399 - 2403, XP031659888 [Y] 1-15 * Sect.s I-V * | [Y] - CAMPANELLA S J ET AL, "Network control for multibeam TDMA and SS/TDMA", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (19830101), vol. SAC-01, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JSAC.1983.1145906, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 174 - 187, XP002114629 [Y] 1-15 * Sect. V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.1983.1145906 | [A] - HAIPENG LEI ET AL, "Subchannel interference cancellation for GERAN/VAMOS systems", COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY AND APPLICATIONS, 2009. ICCTA '09. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091016), ISBN 978-1-4244-4816-6, pages 157 - 161, XP031577575 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1556589 (DATANG MOBLE COMM APPARATUS CO [CN]); | [A]US2009067517 (HUNG KUN-CHIEN [TW], et al); | [A]CN101822029 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [XP]CN102006128 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |