EP2635982 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING DIGITAL OBJECTS IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Speedment AB Box 1128 40523 Goteborg / SE | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINBORG, Per-Ake Valebergsvagen 7 SE-444 60 Stora Hoga / SE | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 11837645.8 | 02.11.2011 | WO2011IB02905 | Priority number, date | US20100410201P | 04.11.2010 Original published format: US 410201 P | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012059816 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2635982 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
G06F16/2343 (EP,US);
G06F16/1748 (US);
G06F16/24552 (EP,US);
G06F16/252 (EP,US);
G06F16/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG DIGITALER OBJEKTE IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2013/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING DIGITAL OBJECTS IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2013/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'OBJETS NUMÉRIQUES DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 30.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 04.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.01.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - ALEXANDROS LABRINIDIS ET AL, "Caching and Materialization for Web Databases", FOUNDATIONS AND TRENDS IN DATABASES, (20100101), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1561/1900000005, ISSN 1931-7883, pages 169 - 266, XP055121212 [X] 1-3,12-15 * page 175, paragraph 1 - page 176, paragraph 1; figure 2.1 * * page 182, paragraph 1 - paragraph l * * page 182, paragraph l - page 183, paragraph 1 * * page 189, paragraph 4 * * page 191, paragraph 2 - page 195, paragraph 4 * [I] 4-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1561/1900000005 | [A] - BRAD FITZPATRICK, "Distributed Caching with Memcached", LINUX JOURNAL, US, (20040801), vol. 2004, no. 124, ISSN 1075-3583, page 5, XP055356436 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 4 * * page 6, paragraph l - page 7, paragraph 2 * | [A] - All, "Oracle TimesTen In-Memory Database Architectural Overview Release 6.0", (20060101), URL: http://download.oracle.com/otn_hosted_doc/timesten/603/TimesTen-Documentation/arch.pdf, (20131119), XP055089143 [A] 1-15 * page 9 - page 15 * * page 18 * * page 33 - page 36 * * page 75 - page 80 * | International search | [A]GB2366406 (NCR INT INC [US]); | [X]US2006095434 (MCCULLOUGH CHARLES [US], et al); | [X]US2007250601 (AMLEKAR SHEKHAR [IN], et al) |