EP2636772 - COLQUIRIITE-TYPE CRYSTAL, SCINTILLATOR FOR NEUTRON DETECTION, AND NEUTRON RADIATION DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-8648 / JP | For all designated states Tohoku University 2-1-1, Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIZU, Sumito c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 02 /
FUKUDA, Kentaro c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 03 /
KAWAGUCHI, Noriaki c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIKAWA, Akira C/O TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 05 /
YANAGIDA, Takayuki C/O TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 06 /
YOKOTA, Yui C/O TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 07 /
FUJIMOTO, Yutaka C/O TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11838031.0 | 01.11.2011 | [2017/05] | WO2011JP75196 | Priority number, date | JP20100246218 | 02.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010246218 | [2013/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012060381 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2636772 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2636772 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/12, C09K11/00, C09K11/64, G01T3/06, C09K11/77, C30B15/00, C30B15/08 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
G01T3/06 (EP,US);
C30B15/00 (EP,US);
C30B15/08 (EP,US);
C30B29/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/37] | C30B29/12, C09K11/00, C09K11/64, G01T3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COLQUIRIIT-KRISTALL, SZINTILLATOR ZUR NEUTRONENDETEKTION UND NEUTRONENSTRAHLUNGSDETEKTOR | [2013/37] | English: | COLQUIRIITE-TYPE CRYSTAL, SCINTILLATOR FOR NEUTRON DETECTION, AND NEUTRON RADIATION DETECTOR | [2013/37] | French: | CRISTAL DE TYPE COLQUIRIITE, SCINTILLATEUR POUR LA DÉTECTION DE NEUTRONS ET DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONNEMENT NEUTRONIQUE | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2013 | Translation filed | 15.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 20.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2011 | AL | 01.02.2017 | AT | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | DK | 01.02.2017 | EE | 01.02.2017 | ES | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | HR | 01.02.2017 | IT | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | MK | 01.02.2017 | NL | 01.02.2017 | PL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | RS | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | SM | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | BG | 01.05.2017 | NO | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | IE | 01.11.2017 | LU | 01.11.2017 | MT | 01.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 01.11.2011 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
TR | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.11.2011 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.11.2011 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.11.2011 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
IT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006033025 (ICHINOSE NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2009119378 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP], et al) [YD] 1,3-6 * examples 1,2 * * comparative example 1 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0015] *; | [Y] - YOKOTA Y ET AL, "Effects of charge compensation by Na + co-doping for Ce 3+ doped LiCaAlF 6 single crystals", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM CONFERENCE RECORD (NSS/MIC), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, (20101030), doi:10.1109/NSSMIC.2010.5873752, ISBN 978-1-4244-9106-3, pages 223 - 225, XP032054027 [Y] 1,3-6 * page 223 - page 225 * * page 223, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.2010.5873752 | [A] - YOSHIKAWA A ET AL, "Single Crystal Growth, Optical Properties and Neutron Response of Doped", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20091201), vol. 56, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TNS.2009.2033115, ISSN 0018-9499, pages 3796 - 3799, XP011285478 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNS.2009.2033115 | [A] - FURUYA Y ET AL, "Crystal growth and scintillation properties of lithium potassium yttrium complex fluoride", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM CONFERENCE RECORD (NSS/MIC), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, (20101030), doi:10.1109/NSSMIC.2010.5873753, ISBN 978-1-4244-9106-3, pages 226 - 229, XP032054028 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.2010.5873753 | [A] - AKIRA YOSHIKAWA ET AL, "Crystal growth, optical properties and neutron responses of Ce3+ doped LiCaAlF DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.2008.4774622 | [A] - Vida K Castillo ET AL, "Material and laser characterization of Ce,Na:LiSrCa1..AlF6 compounds", SPIE proceedings, doi:10.1117/12.479160, (20030613), URL: http://proceedings.spiedigitallibrary.org/data/Conferences/SPIEP/32231/22_1.pdf, (20140825), XP055136409 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.479160 | [A] - Athanassios G Kontos ET AL, "An ESR study of a Ce3:Na:LiSrA1F6 single crystal", SPIE Proceedings, doi:10.1117/12.519085, (20031106), URL: http://proceedings.spiedigitallibrary.org/data/Conferences/SPIEP/20861/109_1.pdf, (20140825), XP055136413 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.519085 | [A] - BESSIERE A ET AL, "New Thermal Neutron Scintillators: DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNS.2004.834957 | International search | [A]JP2000351695 (UNIV TOHOKU); | [A]JP2002060299 (TOKIN CORP); | [Y]WO2004086089 (HOKUSHIN CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007045869 (STELLA CHEMIFA CORP); | [Y]WO2009119378 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2011115179 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2009119378 | - C. W. E.; EIJKE AL ., "LiBaF3, a thermal neutron scintillator with optimal n-y discrimination", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS ANDMETHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH A, (1996), vol. 374, doi:doi:10.1016/0168-9002(96)00076-9, pages 197 - 201, XP004007534 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-9002(96)00076-9 |