EP2636240 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RADIO RESOURCE MEASUREMENT IN HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Chengjun Beijing Samsung Telecom R&D Center 12/F Zhongdian Fazhan Building No.9 XiaguangliChaoyang District Beijing 100125 / CN | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/37] | Application number, filing date | 11838269.6 | 04.11.2011 | WO2011KR08385 | Priority number, date | CN201010539179 | 05.11.2010 Original published format: CN201010539179 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012060664 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2636240 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W72/08, // H04W48/20, H04W84/04 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/541 (EP);
H04W88/06 (KR);
H04W48/20 (EP,US);
H04W84/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | H04W24/10, // H04W48/20 | ||
Former IPC [2013/37] | H04W24/00, H04B7/26, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FUNKRESSOURCENMESSUNG IN EINEM HETEROGENEN NETZWERK | [2013/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RADIO RESOURCE MEASUREMENT IN HETEROGENEOUS NETWORK | [2013/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT UNE MESURE DE RESSOURCES RADIO DANS UN RÉSEAU HÉTÉROGÈNE | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 30.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 28.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2020 | 17.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/37] | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6009332 (HAARTSEN JACOBUS C [SE]); | [A]US2005096062 (JI TINGFANG [US], et al); | [X]US2009257390 (JI TINGFANG [US], et al); | [A]CN101867457 (ZTE CORP); | [E]EP2559309 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | EP2584822 [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [E]EP2642797 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [A]US2007064669 (CLASSON BRIAN K [US], et al); | [A]US2009252077 (KHANDEKAR AAMOD D [US], et al); | [A]US2010159936 (BRISEBOIS ARTHUR [US], et al); | [A]US2010195582 (KOSKINEN HENRI MARKUS [FI]) | by applicant | US6009332 | US2009257390 |