EP2635543 - HEAVY ALKYLBENZENE TRANSALKYLATION OPERATING COST REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOHN, Stephen W. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | 02 /
RILEY, Mark G. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 11838447.8 | 19.10.2011 | WO2011US56804 | Priority number, date | US20100917851 | 02.11.2010 Original published format: US 917851 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012061013 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2635543 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/66, C07C4/18, C07C15/02, B01J8/00 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
C07C2/66 (EP,US);
C07C4/14 (US);
C07C6/126 (EP,US);
C07C2521/16 (EP,US);
C07C2529/08 (EP,US);
C07C2529/18 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/66, C07C15/107 (US,EP);
C07C6/126, C07C15/107 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Title | German: | TRANSALKYLIERUNG SCHWERER ALKYLBENZOLE ZU KOSTENSENKUNGSZWECKEN | [2013/37] | English: | HEAVY ALKYLBENZENE TRANSALKYLATION OPERATING COST REDUCTION | [2013/37] | French: | RÉDUCTION DES COÛTS DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE LA TRANSALKYLATION D'ALKYLBENZÈNE LOURD | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 04.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.08.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008100804 (UOP LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]EP2022773 (PETROQUIMICA ESPANOLA S A PETR [ES]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4459426 (INWOOD TEXAS V [US], et al); | [A]US4599470 (GREGORY REGINALD [GB], et al); | [A]US5902917 (COLLINS NICK A [US], et al); | [A]US2007276173 (SPANO' GUIDO [IT], et al) | by applicant | EP2022773 |