EP2635922 - MARINE VIBROSEIS MOTION CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WesternGeco, L.L.C. 10001 Richmond Avenue Houston, TX 77042 / US | For all designated states Geco Technology B.V. Gevers Deynootweg 61 2586 BJ S'Gravenhage / NL | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERBER, Ralf G. 57 Depot Road Horsham West Sussex, Sussex RH13 5HE / GB | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick IP Law Dept Schlumberger Gould Research High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | [2013/37] | Application number, filing date | 11838683.8 | 01.11.2011 | WO2011US58792 | Priority number, date | US20100939381 | 04.11.2010 Original published format: US 939381 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012061391 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2635922 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/28, G01V1/38, G06F19/00, G01V1/36, G01V1/00 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
G01V1/366 (EP,US);
G01V1/005 (EP,US);
G01V2210/1293 (EP,US);
G01V2210/52 (EP,US);
G01V2210/59 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/37] | G01V1/28, G01V1/38, G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Title | German: | MEERESVIBROSEIS-BEWEGUNGSKORREKTUR | [2013/37] | English: | MARINE VIBROSEIS MOTION CORRECTION | [2013/37] | French: | CORRECTION DE MOUVEMENT EN RELEVÉS VIBRO-SISMIQUES MARINS | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 18.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 25.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6049507 (ALLEN KENNETH PAUL [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract ** column 2, line 55 - column 12, line 12 *; | [AD]US2008225642 (MOORE IAN [GB], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AD] - HAMPSON G ET AL, "The effects of source and receiver motion on seismic data", GEOPHYSICAL PROSPECTING, OXFORD, GB, (19950201), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 221 - 244, XP008030943 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * Section "Compensating for the effects of source and receiver motion"; page 236 - page 237 * | [YDA] - DUIJNDAM A J W ET AL, "Reconstruction of band-limited signals, irregularly sampled along one spatial direction", GEOPHYSICS, SOCIETY OF EXPLORATION GEOPHYSICISTS, US, (19990301), vol. 64, no. 2, doi:10.1190/1.1444559, ISSN 0016-8033, pages 524 - 538, XP002272203 [YD] 13 * abstract * * page 524 - page 525 * [A] 1-12,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1444559 | [AD] - I MOORE ET AL, "Bandwidth Optimization for Compact Fourier Interpolation", 70TH EAGE CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, (20080609), pages 1 - 5, XP055316276 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3997/2214-4609.20147735 | [YD] - ZWARTJES P M ET AL, "Fourier reconstruction of nonuniformly sampled, aliased seismic data", GEOPHYSICS, SOCIETY OF EXPLORATION GEOPHYSICISTS, US, (20070201), vol. 72, no. 1, doi:10.1190/1.2399442, ISSN 0016-8033, pages V21 - V32, XP002610852 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.2399442 | International search | [X]US6049507 (ALLEN KENNETH PAUL [US]); | [A]US2008046185 (NIEBAUER TIM [US], et al); | [Y]US2010008187 (JEFFRYES BENJAMIN PETER [GB]) |