EP2637574 - EMERGENCY SELF-RETAINING SUTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/38] | EMERGENCY SELF-RETAINING SUTURES AND PACKAGING | ||
[2016/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Calle C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park Guaynabo 00969 / PR | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'AGOSTINO, William, L. 19 Douglas Drive Hamden Connecticut 06518 / US | 02 /
MERKEL, Matt 6334 Daniel Boone Rd Birdsboro Pennsylvania 19508 / US | 03 /
BOWSER, Ron 421 Birch Hill Rd Shoemakersville Pennsylvania 19555 / US | 04 /
HOYT, Mark 925 White Bear Rd Birdsboro Pennsylvania 19508 / US | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2013/38] | Application number, filing date | 11839516.9 | 09.11.2011 | [2016/43] | WO2011US60069 | Priority number, date | US20100412389P | 10.11.2010 Original published format: US 412389 P | US20100411918P | 09.11.2010 Original published format: US 411918 P | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012064902 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2637574 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2637574 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, A61B17/06 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/06166 (EP,US);
A61B17/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/06133 (EP,US);
A61B17/06138 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B90/92 (EP,US);
A61L17/14 (KR);
D02J3/00 (KR);
A61B17/0466 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0042 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0472 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0479 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06052 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06142 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06147 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06176 (EP,US);
A61B2050/314 (EP,US);
A61B2090/037 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/38] | A61B17/04, A61L17/14, A61B17/03, D02J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTHALTENDE NOTFALLNÄHTE | [2016/16] | English: | EMERGENCY SELF-RETAINING SUTURES | [2016/16] | French: | SUTURES AUTOSTATIQUES D'URGENCE | [2016/16] |
Former [2013/38] | SELBSTHALTENDE NOTFALLNÄHTE UND -VERPACKUNGEN | ||
Former [2013/38] | EMERGENCY SELF-RETAINING SUTURES AND PACKAGING | ||
Former [2013/38] | SUTURES AUTOSTATIQUES D'URGENCE ET CONDITIONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 16.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16189997.6 / EP3138506 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2011 | AL | 26.10.2016 | AT | 26.10.2016 | BE | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | MK | 26.10.2016 | NL | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | RS | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | SM | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | MT | 09.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | NO | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 09.11.2011 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 09.11.2011 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.11.2011 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003149447 (MORENCY STEVEN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0048] * * figure 4 *; | [X]US2007038249 (KOLSTER ALWIN [US]) [X] 1,5-7,10 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066] * * figure 19 *; | [X]US2008200950 (WOHLERT STEPHEN [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,11 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0071] * * figures 1,3,6 *; | [X]US2008255611 (HUNTER WILLIAM L [CA]) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0079] * * figures 2a,b *; | [X]WO2009132284 (ANGIOTECH PHARM INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,11,12 * paragraph [00139] - paragraph [00140] * * figure 10G *; | [X]WO2009151876 (ANGIOTECH PHARM INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,11 * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [00137] - paragraph [00140] * * figures 1A,2D,8-10B *; | [XP]WO2011025760 (ETHICON INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,4-7 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0043] ** figures 3A-5 * | International search | [A]US2002151932 (BRYANT TODD [US], et al); | [A]US2008234731 (LEUNG JEFFREY C [US], et al); | [A]US2008255611 (HUNTER WILLIAM L [CA]); | [A]US2009143819 (D AGOSTINO WILLIAM L [US]) | by applicant | US5931855 | US6241747 | US2003041426 | US2004006041 | US6848152 | WO2009151876 | WO2011025760 |