EP2637639 - TRANSFER RESISTANT COSMETICS AND METHOD OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coty Inc. 2 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARONE, Salvatore, J. 63 Peacock Loop Staten Island New York 10309 / US | 02 /
NGUYEN, Lethu 400 Middlesex Avenue Colonia New Jersey 07067 / US | 03 /
VANCE MAILLARD, Fredericke 7 Cite Martignac F-75007 Paris / FR | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 11839960.9 | 08.11.2011 | WO2011US59744 | Priority number, date | US20100411172P | 08.11.2010 Original published format: US 411172 P | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012064716 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2637639 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/92, A61K8/84, A61K8/72, A61K8/97, A61Q1/06, A61Q19/00, A61K8/34, A61K8/31, A61K8/37, A61K8/81, A61K8/42 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/8111 (EP,US);
A61K8/8117 (EP,US);
A61Q1/00 (US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (US);
A61Q19/00 (US);
A61Q3/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/38] | A61K8/92, A61K8/84, A61K8/72, A61K8/97, A61Q1/00, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Extension states | BA | 07.06.2013 | ME | 07.06.2013 | Title | German: | ABRIEBFESTE KOSMETIKA UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/38] | English: | TRANSFER RESISTANT COSMETICS AND METHOD OF MAKING | [2013/38] | French: | COSMÉTIQUE RÉSISTANT AU TRANSFERT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2013/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 18.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 01.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2015 | 30.11.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010010295 (OREAL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1 - page 4 * * (especially p. 11-12); page 8 - page 12 * * page 20 - page 23 * * page 29, line 1 - line 2 * * page 44, line 18 - line 25 * * page 13 * * page 34 * * page 45, line 28 - page 46, line 10 * * page 46 - page 47 *; | [Y] - "Caprylyl Glycol", INTERNATIONAL COSMETIC INGREDIENT DICTIONARY AND HANDBOOK Twelfth Edition 2008, Washington, D.C., The Cosmetic, Toiletry, and Fragrance Association, (20080101), vol. 1, page 423, ISBN 978-1-88-262143-9, XP055209762 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - Anonymous, "Bulletin 22 HYDRACIRE S - Jojoba Wax, Sunflower Wax & Mimosa Wax", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20090915), URL: http://alliance2u.com/pdf/Bulletin22.pdf, (20150826), XP055209746 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * | [L] - Anonymous, "Alliance 2U - Official Website - News - List of Bulletins with publication date", (20150826), URL: http://alliance2u.com/news.asp, (20150826), XP055209752 [L] * cited to prove the publication date of XP55209746 * | International search | [A]US2004028641 (BARONE SALVATORE J [US], et al); | [A]US6589538 (LEMANN PATRICIA [FR], et al); | [A]US2009074683 (NGUYEN NGHI VAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2009043898 (COTY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]US5505937 (CASTROGIOVANNI ANTHONY [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2010010295 | US7674848 | US2008287722 | WO2009043898 | US7041278 | US6358498 | US2009220555 |