EP2641954 - NON-ASBESTOS FRICTION MATERIAL COMPOSITION, AND FRICTION MATERIAL AND FRICTION MEMBER USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 9-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNNO, Mitsuo c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 3-1 Ayukawa-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316-0036 / JP | 02 /
BABA, Kazuya c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 3-1 Ayukawa-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316-0036 / JP | 03 /
KIKUDOME, Takashi c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 3-1 Ayukawa-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316-0036 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11840723.8 | 07.11.2011 | WO2011JP75637 | Priority number, date | JP20100259498 | 19.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010259498 | [2013/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012066963 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2641954 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
F16D69/026 (EP,US);
F16D69/02 (KR);
F16D69/028 (US);
C09K3/14 (KR);
F16D65/092 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | C09K3/14, F16D69/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | ASBESTFREIE REIBUNGSMATERIALZUSAMMENSETZUNG SOWIE REIBUNGSMATERIAL UND REIBUNGSELEMENT DAMIT | [2013/39] | English: | NON-ASBESTOS FRICTION MATERIAL COMPOSITION, AND FRICTION MATERIAL AND FRICTION MEMBER USING SAME | [2013/39] | French: | COMPOSITION DE MATÉRIAU DE FROTTEMENT SANS AMIANTE, ET MATÉRIAU DE FROTTEMENT ET ÉLÉMENT DE FROTTEMENT L'UTILISANT | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2013 | Translation filed | 27.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 08.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 31.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE202010003143U (HONEYWELL BREMSBELAG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,10 *; | [I]US2877198 (MORRISSEY RICHARD T) [I] 1-4 * claim 5 * | International search | [Y]JP2002138273 (AKEBONO RES & DEV CENTRE); | [Y]JPH04304284 (AISIN CHEM); | [A]JP2009126903 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND); | [A]JP2008179806 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) | by applicant | JP2002138273 |