EP2642335 - OPTICAL DEFLECTOR AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIKII, Shinichi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1- 61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540 - 6207 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Katsuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1- 61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540 - 6207 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIKAWA, Motonobu c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1- 61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540 - 6207 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Vigand, Philippe Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | Application number, filing date | 11840731.1 | 16.11.2011 | WO2011JP06376 | Priority number, date | US20100414580P | 17.11.2010 Original published format: US 414580 P | [2013/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012066776 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2642335 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, G02F1/29 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
G02F1/29 (EP,US);
G02F1/291 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | G02F1/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER DEFLEKTOR UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE DAMIT | [2013/39] | English: | OPTICAL DEFLECTOR AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE USING SAME | [2013/39] | French: | DÉFLECTEUR OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES LE COMPRENANT | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2012 | Translation filed | 13.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 29.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/14] | 18.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2009026641 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2009026641 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]JP2000507005 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.); | [Y]JP2008134652 (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009053345 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2003066405 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2007199445 (EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORP); | [A]JP2004325494 (RICOH KK) | by applicant | WO2005069918 |