EP2640263 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING INVASIVELY HYPERPOLARIZED IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aspect Imaging Ltd. Hashaked Street 27 A.T. Modi'in P.O. Box 926 60850 Shoham / IL | [2016/24] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Aspect Magnet Technologies Ltd. Hashaked 27 A.T. Modi'in P.O.B. 926 Shoham 60850 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAPOPORT, Uri 17 Moshav Ben Shemen 73115 Moshav Ben Shemen / IL | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 11840863.2 | 16.11.2011 | WO2011IL00885 | Priority number, date | US20100413991P | 16.11.2010 Original published format: US 413991 P | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012066542 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2640263 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
G01R33/282 (EP,US);
G01R33/54 (US);
A61B5/0035 (US);
A61B5/0071 (US);
A61B5/015 (US);
A61B5/05 (US);
A61B5/055 (US);
A61B6/032 (US);
A61B8/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG INVASIV HYPERPOLARISIERTER BILDER | [2013/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR GENERATING INVASIVELY HYPERPOLARIZED IMAGES | [2013/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'IMAGES INVASIVEMENT HYPERPOLARISÉES | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 05.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008290869 (HUTTON GRAHAM MARK [GB], et al); | [Y]US2009016964 (KALECHOFSKY NEAL [US], et al) |