EP2642463 - PERIPHERAL MONITORING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAOKA, Nobuharu c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
AIMURA, Makoto c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/39] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11841502.5 | 09.11.2011 | WO2011JP06276 | Priority number, date | JP20100256296 | 16.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010256296 | [2013/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012066751 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2642463 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60R1/00, G06T1/00, G06T7/00, H04N7/18, G06K9/00 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H04N7/183 (EP,US);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
G08G1/163 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | G08G1/16, B60R1/00, G06T1/00, G06T7/00, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | UMGEBUNGSÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2013/39] | English: | PERIPHERAL MONITORING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2013/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA PÉRIPHÉRIE DESTINÉ À UN VÉHICULE | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2013 | Translation filed | 05.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 22.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2015 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 25.06.2015 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 24.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 26.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/14] | 14.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2224743 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0027]; figure 6(a) *; | [X]US2009066490 (MITZUTANI MASAMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0017] * * column 156 - column 173; figure 15 *; | [X] - BERTOZZI M ET AL, "A Symmetry-based Validator and Refinement System for Pedestrian Detection in Far Infrared Images", INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, 2007. ITSC 2007. IEEE, IEEE, PI, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1395-9, pages 155 - 160, XP031151440 [X] 1-6 * Section IV * | [X] - BERTOZZI M ET AL, "Shape-based pedestrian detection and localization", INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. 2003 IEEE OCT. 12-15, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031012), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ITSC.2003.1251972, ISBN 978-0-7803-8125-4, pages 328 - 333, XP010673843 [X] 1-6 * Section III.B, Section III.D * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITSC.2003.1251972 | [X] - Guanglin Ma ET AL, "A Symmetry Search and Filtering Algorithm for Vision Based Pedestrian Detection System", SAE technical paper, doi:10.4271/2008-01-1252., (20080414), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://delphi.com/pdf/techpapers/2008-01-1252.pdf, (20140515), XP055118323 [X] 1-6 * Section IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4271/2008-01-1252 | International search | [A]JP2007328630 (FUJITSU TEN LTD, et al); | [A]JP2006084218 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2008065756 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2008021034 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]JP2003284057 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JP4486997B | JP2001006096 | JP2007264778 | JP2007241740 | JP2007334751 | JP2003016429 | JP2008276787 | JP2007310705 | JP2007310706 |