EP2641736 - MULTILAYER RESIN SHEET AND RESIN-SHEET LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 9-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTOH, Masaki c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 48 Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 02 /
KATAGI, Hideyuki c/o Hitachi Chemical Company Ltd. 1150 Goshomiya Chikusei-shi Ibaraki 308-8524 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11841519.9 | 17.11.2011 | WO2011JP76551 | Priority number, date | JP20100257765 | 18.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010257765 | JP20110064923 | 23.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011064923 | [2013/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012067194 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2641736 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/38, B32B15/092, B32B27/20, B32B27/08 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
B32B15/092 (EP,KR);
B32B27/20 (EP,KR);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/38 (EP,KR);
B32B7/12 (KR);
C09J11/04 (KR);
C09J163/00 (KR);
B32B2260/025 (EP);
B32B2264/10 (EP);
B32B2307/206 (EP);
B32B2307/302 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
B32B2405/00 (EP);
B32B2457/00 (KR);
B32B2457/04 (EP);
B32B2457/08 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | B32B27/38, B32B15/092, B32B27/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | MEHRLAGIGE HARZFOLIE UND HARZFOLIENLAMINAT | [2013/39] | English: | MULTILAYER RESIN SHEET AND RESIN-SHEET LAMINATE | [2013/39] | French: | FEUILLE EN RÉSINE MULTICOUCHE ET STRATIFIÉ DE FEUILLES DE RÉSINE | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2013 | Translation filed | 04.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 05.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2626205 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14 * claims 1,2 * * page 28; example 15d; table 3 * * page 25, paragraph 0201 * * paragraphs [0163] , [0165] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraphs [0145] , [0147] * | International search | [A]JP2006321216 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2008013759 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO, et al); | [A]JP2008308675 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008013759 | JP4118691B | JP2005206814 | JP2010257765 | JP2011064923 |