EP2640392 - SUBSTITUTED 4-(SELENOPHEN-2(OR 3)-YLAMINO)PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kasina Laila Innova Pharmaceuticals Private Ltd. 40-15-14 Brindavan Colony Labbipet Vijayawada 520 010 Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOKARAJU, Ganga Raju 40-15-14 Brindavan Colony Labbipet Vijayawada 520010 Andhra Pradesh / IN | 02 /
KASINA, Sudhakar 8215 E. Mercer Way Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | 03 /
SOMEPALLI, Venkateswarlu 40-15-14 Brindavan Colony Labbipet Vijayawada 520010 Andhra Pradesh / IN | 04 /
GOKARAJU, Rama Raju 40-15-14 Brindavan Colony Labbipet Vijayawada 520010 Andhra Pradesh / IN | 05 /
GOKARAJU, Venkata Kanaka Ranga Raju 40-15-14 Brindavan Colony Labbipet Vijayawada 520 010 Andhra Pradesh / IN | 06 /
BHUPATHIRAJU, Kiran 40-15-14 Brindavan Colony Labbipet Vijayawada 520 010 Andhra Pradesh / IN | 07 /
GOLAKOTI, Trimurtulu 40-15-14 Brindavan Colony Labbipet Vijayawada 520 010 Andhra Pradesh / IN | 08 /
SENGUPTA, Krishanu 40-15-14 Brindavan Colony Labbipet Vijayawada 520 010 Andhra Pradesh / IN | 09 /
ALLURI, Venkata Krishna Raju 40-15-14 Brindavan Colony Labbipet Vijayawada 520 010 Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11841996.9 | 17.11.2011 | WO2011IN00801 | Priority number, date | IN2010CHE3468 | 18.11.2010 Original published format: IN CH34682010 | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012066578 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2640392 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2640392 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/517, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D491/048, C07D421/12, C07D495/04, C07D517/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/519, A61P35/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/5377 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
C07D421/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61K31/517 (US);
A61K31/519 (US);
A61K31/5377 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D491/048 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
C07D513/04 (EP,US);
C07D517/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | A61K31/517 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 4-(SELENOPHEN-2-(ODER 3-)YLAMINO-)PYRIMIDINVERBINDUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/39] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 4-(SELENOPHEN-2(OR 3)-YLAMINO)PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2013/39] | French: | COMPOSÉS 4-(SÉLÉNOPHÈN-2(OU 3)-YLAMINO)PYRIMIDINES SUBSTITUÉS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 03.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2011 | AL | 07.01.2015 | AT | 07.01.2015 | BE | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | ES | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | IT | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | RS | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | SM | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.11.2011 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PT | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.11.2011 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 07.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6919338 (MORTLOCK ANDREW [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * compounds of the examples; column 1, paragraph 2; claims 1,10-12 *; | [A]WO2008070176 (KUO SHENG-CHU, et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1; example 7; claims 1,20 *; | [A]WO2009085040 (DCB USA LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* compounds 1-57 on pages 5-10; page 1, paragraph 2; claims 1,24,25 *; | [A]US2010272678 (GOKARAJU GANGA RAJU [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * compounds of the examples; page 1, paragraphs 1-5; claims 1,4,7,8,22,23 * | International search | [A]US6620804 (CHANG CHING-JER [US], et al); | [A]US6919338 (MORTLOCK ANDREW [GB], et al); | [A]US2008021031 (SHIA KAK-SHAN [TW], et al); | [A]US7417055 (CANNIZZARO CARINA [US], et al); | [A]US2010272678 (GOKARAJU GANGA RAJU [IN], et al) | by applicant | WO2008070176 | WO2009085040 | US2010272678 | - K.M. AUMANN ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 5, pages 1276 - 1281 | - AUMANN, K.M., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 5, pages 1276 - 1281 | - GAZIT, A., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 4, pages 1203 - 1207 | - FURUTA, T. ET AL., J MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 49, pages 2186 - 2192 | - LIU, G., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 15, pages 6608 - 6617 | - WANG, J.-Q., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2006), vol. 16, pages 4102 - 4106 | - PLE, P.A., J MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, pages 871 - 887 | - MARZARO, G., TETRAHEDRON, (2010), vol. 66, pages 962 - 968 | - KNESL, P., MOLECULES, (2006), vol. 11, pages 286 - 297 | - SHAUL, M., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 12, pages 3421 - 3429 | - FERNANDES, C., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 15, pages 3974 - 3980 | - HESSE, S., SYNTHESIS, (2009), pages 1204 - 1208 | - THOMAE, D. ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (2008), pages 1600 - 1606 | - ROBINS, R.K., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1955), vol. 77, pages 2256 - 2260 | - HORIUCHI, T., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2009), vol. 19, pages 305 - 308 | - FOLEY, L.H., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1994), vol. 35, pages 5989 - 5992 | - MATSUDA, T., CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1985), vol. 33, pages 937 - 943 | - FISCHER, R.W., ORG. PROC. RES. DEV., (2001), vol. 5, pages 581 - 586 | - THOMAE, D., TETRAHEDRON, (2008), vol. 64, pages 9309 - 9314 | - LIN, R., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2009), vol. 19, pages 2333 - 2337 | - ZHANG, X., GREEN CHEM., (2009), vol. 11, pages 1881 - 1888 | - WALKER, G., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1955), vol. 77, pages 6698 - 6699 | - LI, H.-Z., MOLECULES, (2010), vol. 15, pages 9473 - 9485 | - MCKEE, R.L., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1946), vol. 68, pages 1902 - 1903 | - TSUBONI, S., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1986), vol. 27, pages 2643 - 2644 |