EP2641997 - LAMINATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NHK Spring Co., Ltd. 3-10, Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAUCHI, Yuichiro c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Shinji c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 03 /
AKABAYASHI, Masaru c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 04 /
HIRANO, Satoshi c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 2-1-49 Numame Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1126 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11842434.0 | 17.11.2011 | WO2011JP77115 | Priority number, date | JP20100259412 | 19.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010259412 | [2013/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012067263 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2641997 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/04, B32B18/00, H01L23/36, H05K1/03, H05K3/38, B23K35/00, C04B41/90, C04B41/52, C04B41/00, C23C28/00 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
B23K35/001 (EP,US);
C23C24/04 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/11 (US);
B32B18/00 (KR);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/90 (EP,US);
C23C28/322 (EP,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
H01L23/36 (KR);
H05K1/03 (KR);
C04B2111/00844 (EP,US);
H01L23/15 (EP,US);
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K3/0061 (EP,US);
H05K3/388 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12611 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/00 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4545, C04B41/5094, C04B41/5116, C04B41/515, C04B41/522 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4545, C04B41/50, C04B41/5116, C04B41/5127 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4545, C04B41/50, C04B41/5116, C04B41/5155, C04B41/522 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4545, C04B41/5127, C04B41/522 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2013/39] | C23C24/04, B32B18/00, H01L23/36, H05K1/03, H05K3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | LAMINAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/39] | English: | LAMINATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING LAMINATE | [2013/39] | French: | STRATIFIÉ ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE STRATIFIÉ | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2013 | Translation filed | 14.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 02.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 07.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010290490 (HAMMEL ERNST [AT], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,5,6 * * page 1, paragraph 20 - page 2, paragraph 22 * * page 2, paragraph 28 - page 3, paragraph 33 *; | [A]US2004065432 (SMITH JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraph 28 - page 6, paragraph 45 *; | [A]EP1667508 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, paragraphs 4-6 * * page 3, paragraph 16 - page 4, paragraph 25 * * page 5, paragraphs 28-32 * | International search | [A]JP2009197294 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2010106317 (NIHON CERATEC CO LTD); | [A]JP2010129934 (SINTOKOGIO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2010522974 (ELECTROVAC AG.) |