EP2643818 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VISUALIZING A VOLUME DATASET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intrinsic Medical Imaging, Inc. 2677 Brewer Road Howell, MI 48855 / US | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKENZIE, Lee, R. 2677 Brewer Road Howell MI 48855 / US | 02 /
MCKENZIE, Mark, C. 2677 Brewer Road Howell MI 48855 / US | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Hirsz, Christopher Stanislaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Hirsz, Christopher Stanislaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11842472.0 | 09.11.2011 | WO2011US59897 | Priority number, date | US20100954856 | 27.11.2010 Original published format: US 954856 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012071172 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2643818 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/08, G06T15/06 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G06T15/06 (EP,US);
G06T19/20 (US);
G06T15/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/40] | G06T15/08, A61B6/00, A61B5/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VISUALISIERUNG EINES VOLUMENDATENSATZES | [2013/40] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VISUALIZING A VOLUME DATASET | [2013/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE VISUALISATION D'ENSEMBLE DE DONNÉES DE VOLUME | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 26.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0947960 (AVID TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * page 6, column R, line 20 - line 30 *; | [Y]US2008024493 (BORDOLOI UDEEPTA D [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3, 4, 5A, 6-8, 11 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0091] *; | [A] - Dávid Jocha ET AL, "Interactive Virtual Colonoscopy", (20011231), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://www.cescg.org/CESCG-2001/DJochaJKoloszar/index.html, (20150619), XP055197040 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * sub-chapters 2.1, 2.2 * * figure 2 * | International search | [A]US6931093 (OP DE BEEK JOHANNES CATHARINA [NL], et al); | [A]US2008317321 (ZHANG HUI [US], et al); | [A]US7505037 (WANG BAI [US]); | [A]US2009219289 (KALVIN ALAN D [US]) | by applicant | EP0947960 | US2008024493 | - DAVID JOCHA ET AL., "Interactive Virtual Colonoscopy", CESCG-2001, (2001), URL: http://www.cescg.org/CESCG-2001/DJochaJKoloszar/index.html |