EP2643255 - METHOD FOR PRESENTING INFORMATION DURING A RUN WITH AN ELEVATOR; AND ALSO AN ELEVATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄRKÖNEN, Ari Riuttantie 129 FI-11910 Riihimäki / FI | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Koch · von Behren & Partner mbB Donnersbergerstraße 22A 80634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11842558.6 | 07.11.2011 | WO2011FI50981 | Priority number, date | FI20100006228 | 22.11.2010 Original published format: FI 20106228 | [2013/40] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012069694 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2643255 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 31.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B66B3/00, G09F21/00 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
B66B3/008 (EP,US);
B66B3/00 (FI);
G09F21/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/40] | B66B3/00, G09F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRÄSENTATION VON INFORMATIONEN WÄHREND EINER FAHRSTUHLFAHRT UND FAHRSTUHLSYSTEM | [2013/40] | English: | METHOD FOR PRESENTING INFORMATION DURING A RUN WITH AN ELEVATOR; AND ALSO AN ELEVATOR SYSTEM | [2013/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE PRÉSENTER DES INFORMATIONS PENDANT UN TRAJET DANS UN ASCENSEUR, ET SYSTÈME D'ASCENSEUR ASSOCIÉ | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 29.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2017214 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,13-16 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * [Y] 6,8-12 [I] 7; | [X]JPH07252029 (HITACHI BUILDING SYST ENG) [X] 1,13 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2009090206 (INVENTIO AG [CH], et al) [Y] 6,8,9 * page 17 *; | [Y]US2010217657 (GAZDZINSKI ROBERT F [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0092] *; | [Y]JPH07315699 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 11,12 * abstract *; | [A]KR890002794B (GOLD STAR CO [KR]) [A] 11,12 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH07252029 (HITACHI BUILDING SYST ENG); | [X]JPH09328264 (HITACHI BUILDING SYST CO LTD); | [X]US6076638 (GERTZ LAURENCE D [US]); | [Y]WO2008135627 (KONE CORP [FI], et al); | [Y]EP1864933 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) |