EP2643489 - EXTRACTION OF ALKALI METALS AND/OR ALKALINE EARTH METALS FOR USE IN CARBON SEQUESTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newcastle Innovation Limited Industry Development Centre University Drive Callaghan, NSW 2308 / AU | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DLUGOGORSKI, Bogdan Z 26A Ocean Avenue Anna Bay New South Wales 2316 / AU | 02 /
GHOORAH, Manisha 1 Lee Crescent Birmingham Gardens New South Wales 2287 / AU | 03 /
KENNEDY, Eric M 64 Church Street Newcastle New South Wales 2300 / AU | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Kalhammer, Georg Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Kalhammer, Georg Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11843209.5 | 25.11.2011 | WO2011AU01537 | Priority number, date | AU20100905241 | 26.11.2010 Original published format: AU 2010905241 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012068639 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2643489 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/16, B01D53/62, C01B31/24 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
C22B26/20 (EP,US);
B01D53/62 (EP,US);
C01B32/60 (EP,US);
C22B26/10 (EP,US);
C22B3/165 (EP,US);
B01D2251/304 (EP,US);
B01D2251/306 (EP,US);
B01D2251/402 (EP,US);
B01D2251/404 (EP,US);
B01D2252/103 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D53/78 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y02P10/146 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US);
Y02P20/151 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | EXTRAKTION VON ALKALIMETALLEN UND/ODER ALKALIERDMETALLEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER KOHLENSTOFFSEQUESTRIERUNG | [2013/40] | English: | EXTRACTION OF ALKALI METALS AND/OR ALKALINE EARTH METALS FOR USE IN CARBON SEQUESTRATION | [2013/40] | French: | EXTRACTION DE MÉTAUX ALCALINS ET/OU DE MÉTAUX ALCALINO-TERREUX POUR UTILISATION DANS LA SÉQUESTRATION DU CARBONE | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/51] | 17.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005180910 (PARK AH-HYUNG [US], et al); | [X]US2009301352 (CONSTANTZ BRENT R [US], et al); | [X]WO2008061305 (ORICA EXPLOSIVES TECH PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]US2004213705 (BLENCOE JAMES G [US], et al) |