EP2560380 - CHAPTER CREATION DEVICE, CHAPTER CREATION METHOD, AND CHAPTER CREATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVC Kenwood Corporation 12 Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKINO, Masaaki c/o JVC KENWOOD Corporation 12 Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 02 /
FUJII, Takeya c/o JVC KENWOOD Corporation 12 Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2210022 / JP | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/08] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11843988.4 | 07.10.2011 | [2018/03] | WO2011JP05665 | Priority number, date | JP20100261776 | 24.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010261776 | JP20100261777 | 24.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010261777 | JP20100261778 | 24.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010261778 | JP20110213494 | 28.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011213494 | [2013/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012070180 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2560380 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2560380 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/8543 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
H04N5/76 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04N21/2187 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/91 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | H04N5/91, G11B27/02, H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPITELERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, KAPITELERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND KAPITELERSTELLUNGSPROGRAMM | [2013/08] | English: | CHAPTER CREATION DEVICE, CHAPTER CREATION METHOD, AND CHAPTER CREATION PROGRAM | [2013/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME DE CRÉATION DE CHAPITRES | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2012 | Translation filed | 11.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 09.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 25.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2011 | AL | 17.01.2018 | AT | 17.01.2018 | CY | 17.01.2018 | CZ | 17.01.2018 | DK | 17.01.2018 | EE | 17.01.2018 | ES | 17.01.2018 | FI | 17.01.2018 | HR | 17.01.2018 | IT | 17.01.2018 | LT | 17.01.2018 | LV | 17.01.2018 | MC | 17.01.2018 | MK | 17.01.2018 | NL | 17.01.2018 | PL | 17.01.2018 | PT | 17.01.2018 | RO | 17.01.2018 | RS | 17.01.2018 | SE | 17.01.2018 | SI | 17.01.2018 | SK | 17.01.2018 | SM | 17.01.2018 | TR | 17.01.2018 | BG | 17.04.2018 | NO | 17.04.2018 | GR | 18.04.2018 | IS | 17.05.2018 | GB | 07.10.2018 | IE | 07.10.2018 | LU | 07.10.2018 | MT | 07.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.10.2011 | |
AL | 17.01.2018 | ||
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.10.2018 | ||
MT | 07.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.10.2018 | ||
MT | 07.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
TR | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.10.2018 | ||
MT | 07.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.10.2018 | ||
MT | 07.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
LU | 07.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
DK | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
IT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
AT | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
ES | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
PL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 17.01.2018 | |
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
NL | 17.01.2018 | ||
NO | 17.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0072494 (AVID SPORTS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8 * figure 5A * * page 1, line 5 - line 18 * * page 2, line 6 - line 15 * * page 5, line 28 - page 12, line 19 * * page 13, line 14 - line 22 * * page 15, line 17 - line 25 * [I] 2,4; | [XI]US2009164904 (HOROWITZ STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * [I] 2-4; | [XAI]US2010251295 (AMENTO BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * [A] 4 [I] 2,3,5-8; | [A]US2001010523 (SEZAN M IBRAHIM [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 16 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0250] - paragraph [0280] * * paragraph [0628] - paragraph [0630] *; | [A]US2007286584 (YUKIMATSU YOSUKE [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0074] *; | [A]US2008140385 (MAHAJAN MILIND [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] * | International search | [A]JP2008312183 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2006157689 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2007037031 (TOSHIBA CORP) | [Y] - HISASHI MIYAMORI, "Automatic Indexing of Broadcast Content using its Live Chat on the Web", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT, (20050218), vol. 104, no. 670, pages 43 - 48, XP010851624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2005.1530625 | [Y] - KYOKO ARIYASU ET AL., "How to Generate Trackback between Text Comments and TV programs", FIT2007 DAI 6 KAI FORUM ON INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY IPPAN KOEN RONBUNSHU, SEPARATE VOL.1, IPPAN KOEN RONBUN, MODEL ALGORITHM PROGRAMMING SOFTWARE HARDWARE ARCHITECTURE, (20070822), vol. 1, pages 153 - 154, XP008166683 | [Y] - KYOKO ARIYASU, "An Intelligence Circulation System Based on Analyses of Viewer's Comments", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT, (20090108), vol. 108, no. 378, pages 5 - 9, XP008166601 | by applicant | JP2006245907 |