EP2645855 - LOW TOXICITY, LOW ODOR, LOW VOLATILITY SOLVENT FOR AGRICULTURAL CHEMICAL FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Petrochemical LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERGUSON, Dave 6663 Knollbridge Lane Spring TX 77379 / US | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Van den Broeck, Kristel Alice, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [2013/41] | Application number, filing date | 11844153.4 | 29.11.2011 | WO2011US62338 | Priority number, date | US20100419314P | 03.12.2010 Original published format: US 419314 P | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012074975 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2645855 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/00 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
A01N25/02 (EP,US);
A01N43/80 (US);
A01N33/18 (US);
A01N37/22 (US);
A01N37/34 (US);
A01N43/653 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/02, A01N33/18, A01N37/22, A01N37/22, A01N43/653, A01N43/80, A01N53/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | GERUCHSARMES LÖSUNGSMITTEL VON GERINGER TOXIZITÄT UND GERINGER FLÜCHTIGKEIT FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE CHEMISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN | [2013/41] | English: | LOW TOXICITY, LOW ODOR, LOW VOLATILITY SOLVENT FOR AGRICULTURAL CHEMICAL FORMULATIONS | [2013/41] | French: | SOLVANT DE FAIBLE TOXICITÉ, À FAIBLE ODEUR ET DE FAIBLE VOLATILITÉ POUR FORMULATIONS AGROCHIMIQUES | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 22.08.2013 | Observations by third parties | 06.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2016 | 06.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/22] | 27.01.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4886656 (OBAYASHI HISASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1210877 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003069135 (KOBER REINER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16* the whole document *; | [XY]US2004063583 (ZEN SHIGEKAZU [JP]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * [Y] 15,16; | [XY]US2009105073 (TARANTA CLAUDE [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-16 | International search | [Y]US4886656 (OBAYASHI HISASHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2004063583 (ZEN SHIGEKAZU [JP]); | [Y]US2009082206 (IKEUCHI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2009105073 (TARANTA CLAUDE [DE], et al) | other | EP1210877 | US2003069135 |