EP2646506 - THIXOTROPIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coavel, Inc. 6756 Concession 4 Puslinch, ON N0B 2JO / CA | [2018/18] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Omnis Biotechnology Inc. 6756 Concession 4 R.R. 6 Guelph, Ontario N1H 6J3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARANGONI, Alejandro 6756 Concession 4 R.R. 6 Guleph, Ontario N1H 6J3 / CA | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2013/41] | Rigby, Barbara Nicole, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11844174.0 | 29.11.2011 | [2018/46] | WO2011CA01314 | Priority number, date | US20100418615P | 01.12.2010 Original published format: US 418615 P | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012071651 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2646506 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2646506 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 07.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K8/37, A23D9/007, A61K8/73, A61K47/14, A61K47/38, A61K8/92, C08K5/101, C08K5/103, A61Q19/00, A61K8/86, A61K47/44, C08J3/09, C08L91/00 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
A61K47/44 (EP,US);
A23D9/007 (US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C08J3/095 (EP,US);
C08K5/101 (EP,US);
C08K5/103 (EP,US);
C08L91/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,US);
C08J2301/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/101, C08L1/28 (US,EP);
C08K5/103, C08L1/28 (US,EP);
C08L91/00, C08L1/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/43] | C08L1/28, A61K47/14, A61K47/38, A61K47/44, A61K8/37, A61K8/73, A61K8/92, C08J3/02, C08K5/103, C08L91/00, A23D9/007, A61Q19/00, A61K8/86, A61K9/00, C08J3/09, C08K5/101 | ||
Former IPC [2013/41] | C08L1/28, A61K47/14, A61K47/38, A61K47/44, A61K8/37, A61K8/73, A61K8/92, C08J3/02, C08K5/103, C08L91/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THIXOTROPE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2013/41] | English: | THIXOTROPIC COMPOSITIONS | [2013/41] | French: | COMPOSITIONS THIXOTROPES | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 21.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2011 | AL | 14.11.2018 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | IE | 29.11.2018 | LU | 29.11.2018 | MT | 29.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | FR | 14.01.2019 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AL | 14.11.2018 | ||
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
MT | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
MT | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
MT | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4357168 (ZWEIGLE MAURICE L, et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1 - page 1290 * * page 1289 *; | [E]EP2440066 (MARS INC [US]) [E] 1,4-9 * page 3, lines 19-25 * * pages 7-8 * * page 10, lines 10-13 * * tables 1-3 ** claims 1, 4, 5 *; | [X] - MA.A RUIZ MARTINEZ ET AL, "Influence of the concentration of a gelling agent and the type of surfactant on the rheological characteristics of oleogels", IL FARMACO, (20031201), vol. 58, no. 12, doi:10.1016/S0014-827X(03)00180-0, ISSN 0014-827X, pages 1289 - 1294, XP055117540 [X] 1,4-9 * example 4 * * claims 1, 4, 10, 11, 13, 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-827X(03)00180-0 | International search | [XP]WO2010143066 (MARS INC [US], et al); | [X] - RUIZ MARTINEZ, M.A. ET AL., "Influence of the concentration of a gelling agent and the type of surfactant on the rheological characteristics of oleogels.", IL FARMACO, (2003), vol. 58, pages 1289 - 1294, XP055117540 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-827X(03)00180-0 | [A] - OJIJO, N.K.O. ET AL., "Effects of monoglyceride content, cooling rate and shear on the rheological properties of olive oil/monoglyceride gel networks", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (20040803), vol. 84, pages 1585 - 1593, XP055117541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.1831 | [A] - GAUTHIER, P. ET AL., "Novel glyceride gels II. Viscosity characteristics", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 18, pages 229 - 235, XP002093987 | [A] - DO, T.A.L ET AL., "Use of ethylcellulose polymers as stabilizer in fat based food suspensions examined on the example of model reduced-fat chocolate", REACTIVE AND FUNCTIONAL POLYMERS, (201008), vol. 70, pages 856 - 862, XP027247168 | [XP] - GRAVELLE, A.J ET AL., "Characterization of the Mechanical Properties of Edible Oil organogels for Application in Food System", PHYSICALLY-INSPIRED APPROACHES FROM THE NANOSCALE TO THE MICROSCALE. 4TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, (20110821), URL: http://www.uoguelph.ca/foodscience/content/delivery-functionality-complex-food-systems, XP055117552 | [XP] - WOOD, J. ET AL., "Mechanical Properties of Edible Oil Organogels for Application in Emulsified Meat Batters", PHYSICALLY-INSPIRED APPROACHES FROM THE NANOSCALE TO THE MICROSCALE. 4TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM., (20110821), pages 159 - 160, URL: http://www.uoguelph.ca/foodscience/content/delivery-functionality-complex-food-systems, XP055117558 |