EP2646471 - ANTI-BRADYKININ B2 RECEPTOR (BKB2R) MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diamedica Inc. 200-135 Innovation Drive Winnipeg, Manitoba R3T 6A8 / CA | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Mark, S. 4400 Oakview Lane N. Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | 02 /
CHARLES, Matthew, L. 7121 Excelsior Way St Louis Park, MN 55426 / US | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11844439.7 | 01.12.2011 | WO2011US62967 | Priority number, date | US20100419609P | 03.12.2010 Original published format: US 419609 P | US201161522586P | 11.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161522586 P | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012075342 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2646471 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P3/00, A61P35/00, A61P9/00 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Title | German: | MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN DEN BRADYKININ-B2-REZEPTOR (BKB2R) | [2013/41] | English: | ANTI-BRADYKININ B2 RECEPTOR (BKB2R) MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY | [2013/41] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL ANTI-RÉCEPTEUR DE LA BRADYKININE B2 (BKB2R) | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 20.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2014 | 31.12.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6307027 (LINEMEYER DAVID L [US], et al); | [A]US2008004432 (RUBEN STEVEN M [US], et al); | [A] - BLAUKAT, A. ET AL., "DOWNREGULATION OF BRADYKININ B2 RECEPTOR IN HUMAN FIBROBLASTS DURING PROLONGED AGONIST EXPOSURE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY : HEART AND CIRCULATORY PHYSIOLOGY, (20030601), vol. 284, no. 6, pages 1909 - 1916, XP055108367 | [A] - JONG, Y. -J. I. ET AL., "HUMAN BRADYKININ B2 RECEPTORS ISOLATED BY RECEPTOR-SPECIFIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES ARE TYROSINE PHOSPHORYLATED", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (19931201), vol. 90, no. 23, pages 10994 - 10998, XP055108370 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.23.10994 |