EP2648346 - OPTICAL TRANSPORT SYSTEM, OPTICAL TRANSMITTER DEVICE AND OPTICAL RECEIVER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2020/23] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Tsuyoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SUGIHARA, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
ISHIDA, Kazuyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
MIZUOCHI, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/41] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11845299.4 | 30.09.2011 | [2020/23] | WO2011JP72638 | Priority number, date | WO2010JP06967 | 30.11.2010 Original published format: PCT/JP2010/006967 | [2013/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012073590 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2648346 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2648346 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/06, H04J14/00, H04J14/04, H04B10/50, H04B10/532, H04B10/61 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
H04J14/06 (EP,US);
H04B10/5053 (EP,US);
H04B10/532 (EP,US);
H04B10/616 (EP,US);
H04J14/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/41] | H04B10/02, H04B10/18, H04J14/00, H04J14/04, H04J14/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES TRANSPORTSYSTEM, OPTISCHE SENDEVORRICHTUNG UND OPTISCHE EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/41] | English: | OPTICAL TRANSPORT SYSTEM, OPTICAL TRANSMITTER DEVICE AND OPTICAL RECEIVER DEVICE | [2013/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT OPTIQUE, DISPOSITIF ÉMETTEUR OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF RÉCEPTEUR OPTIQUE | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2013 | Translation filed | 25.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 30.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2020 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2011 | AL | 03.06.2020 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | ES | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | IT | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | TR | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | GB | 30.09.2020 | IE | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | LU | 30.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MT | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007206960 (NISSOV MORTEN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0038]; figures 2,2A *; | [XI]US2010215374 (LIU XIANG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12,14-16 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0052]; figures 3,4,5 * [I] 5-10,13; | [XI] - VAN DEN BORNE D ET AL, "1.6-b/s/Hz Spectrally Efficient Transmission Over 1700 km of SSMF Using 40 85.6-Gb/s POLMUX-RZ-DQPSK", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070101), vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JLT.2006.886724, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 222 - 232, XP011175493 [X] 3-9,11,12,14 * page 224, column r, paragraph 2 - page 226, column l, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 226, column r, paragraph 3 - page 227, column l, paragraph 2; figure 6 * [I] 1,2,10,13,15,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2006.886724 | [A] - DOERR C ET AL, "High Spectral Density Long-Haul 40-Gb/s Transmission Using CSRZ-DPSK Format", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040101), vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JLT.2003.822165, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 208 - 214, XP011107637 [A] 1-16 * page 208, column r, paragraph 4 - page 211, column l, paragraph 1; figures 1,2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2003.822165 | International search | [Y]JPH1188299 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2003021816 (KDDI SUBMARINE CABLE SYS INC); | [A]JP2009027525 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2009060461 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JP2009278338 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2010243953 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y] - TAKAHITO TANIMURA ET AL., "Semi-blind Multi- Stage Dual-Polarization Nonlinear Compensation in 112 Gb/s DP-QPSK Coherent Receiver", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT, HIKARI TSUSHIN SYSTEM, (20100722), vol. 110, no. 152, pages 57 - 62, XP008170531 | [Y] - ZHANG B. ET AL., "Penalty-free transmission of 127-Gb/s coherent PM-QPSK over 1500-km of NDSF with 10 cascaded 50-GHz ROADMs", OFC/NFOEC 2010, (201003), XP031676677 | [Y] - JIANJUN Y. ET AL., "20x112Gbit/s, 50GHz spaced, PolMux-RZ-QPSK straight-line transmission over 1540km of SSMF employing digital coherent detection and pure EDFA amplification", ECOC 2008, (200809), pages 1 - 2, XP031381169 |