EP2648176 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND TELEVISION RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUWA, Kenichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
KIGUCHI, Daisaku c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
NISHII, Takeshi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
TAKEUCHI, Junichi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 05 /
EBATA, Yuhsuke c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 06 /
HASEGAWA, Hitoshi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/41] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11845896.7 | 29.11.2011 | [2016/40] | WO2011JP77494 | Priority number, date | JP20100265552 | 29.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010265552 | JP20110145879 | 30.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011145879 | JP20110243646 | 07.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011243646 | [2013/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012073943 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2648176 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2648176 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/00, G02F1/1333, H04N5/64 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
G02F1/133308 (EP,US);
H05K5/0221 (US);
H04N5/64 (US);
G02F1/1309 (EP,US);
G02F2201/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND FERNSEHEMPFÄNGER | [2013/41] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND TELEVISION RECEIVER | [2013/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET RÉCEPTEUR DE TÉLÉVISION | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2013 | Translation filed | 24.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 01.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2011 | AL | 05.10.2016 | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | ES | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | IT | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | NL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | RS | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | SM | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | IE | 29.11.2016 | MT | 29.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
TR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IE | 29.11.2016 | ||
MT | 29.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
IE | 29.11.2016 | ||
MT | 29.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.11.2011 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
IE | 29.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
IE | 29.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2001100650 (HITACHI LTD) [I] 1,2,7-9,12,13 * paragraph [0026]; figures 5,7 * [Y] 3; | [A]US2003103173 (SATONAKA MASAHARU [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0094]; figure 20 *; | [A]WO2007074847 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* figure 7 *; | [YA]JP2007333911 (SHARP KK) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0021]; figures 5-7 * [A] 1,2,8,9,12,13; | [X]EP1892560 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,8,9,12,13 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0076]; figures 6-8 *; | [AD]JP2009042537 (SHARP KK) [AD] 1-13 * figure 8 *; | [A]EP2244476 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034]; figure 7 * | International search | [A]JPH08314392 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [A]JP2001100650 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2001305985 (NEC CORP); | [A]WO03009263 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2003167235 (NIPPON ELECTRIC KAGOSHIMA LTD); | [A]JP2006221576 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2007279537 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2007333911 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2009200543 (PANASONIC CORP); | [A]WO2010113797 (MURAMOTO INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2010237548 (IPS ALPHA TECHNOLOGY LTD); | [A]JP2010243719 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) | Examination | US2001036057 | by applicant | JP2009042537 |