EP2647370 - INFUSION PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/41] | TRANSFUSION PREPARATION | ||
[2019/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Pharmaceutical Factory, Inc. 115, Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa Muya-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima 7728601 / JP | [2018/38] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Otsuka Pharmaceutical Factory, Inc. 115 Aza-Kuguhara Tateiwa Muya-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima 772-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANI, Seiji c/o OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY INC. 115,Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa Muya-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 7728601 / JP | 02 /
MITSUMOTO, Yasuhiro c/o OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY INC. 115, Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa Muya-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 7728601 / JP | [2018/38] |
Former [2013/41] | 01 /
TANI, Seiji c/o OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY INC. 115 Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa Muya-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima 772-8601 / JP | ||
02 /
MITSUMOTO, Yasuhiro c/o OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY INC. 115 Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa Muya-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima 772-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/09] |
Former [2013/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11845978.3 | 28.11.2011 | [2019/09] | WO2011JP77392 | Priority number, date | JP20100265611 | 29.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010265611 | [2013/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012073891 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2647370 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2647370 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K9/107, A61K31/07, A61K31/122, A61K31/198, A61K31/215, A61K31/355, A61K31/375, A61K31/4415, A61K31/519, A61K31/593, A61K31/7004, A61K31/702, A61K31/714, A61P7/08, A61K9/00 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/0029 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61M5/1407 (US);
A23L33/115 (US);
A23L33/125 (US);
A23L33/15 (US);
A23L33/175 (US);
A61J1/2093 (US);
A61K31/07 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/215 (KR);
A61K31/355 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K31/4172 (EP,US);
A61K31/4415 (EP,US);
A61K31/51 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/525 (EP,US);
A61K31/593 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K31/7004 (EP,US);
A61K31/714 (EP,US);
A61K33/14 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/107 (KR);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/07, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/51, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/525, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/593, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2013/41] | A61K9/08, A61K9/107, A61K31/07, A61K31/122, A61K31/198, A61K31/215, A61K31/355, A61K31/375, A61K31/4415, A61K31/519, A61K31/593, A61K31/7004, A61K31/702, A61K31/714, A61P7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFUSIONSPRÄPARAT | [2019/08] | English: | INFUSION PREPARATION | [2019/08] | French: | PRÉPARATION POUR INFUSION | [2019/08] |
Former [2013/41] | TRANSFUSIONSPRÄPARAT | ||
Former [2013/41] | TRANSFUSION PREPARATION | ||
Former [2013/41] | PRÉPARATION POUR TRANSFUSION | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2013 | Translation filed | 13.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 28.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17164509.6 / EP3210598 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2011 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.11.2011 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 28.11.2011 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2005330244 ; | [XY]EP0747033 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * * example 1 * * page 13; table 5 * [Y] 1-5; | [XY]US5728681 (KIDO TAKAE [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-3,5-7; example 1 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-5; | [Y]EP1632233 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * * claims 1,4 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0010] - [0034] *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 01, Database accession no. 2006-003842, XP002723447 & JP2005330244 A 20051202 (AJINOMOTO KK) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH06209979 (GREEN CROSS CORP); | [Y]JPH08709 (GREEN CROSS CORP); | [Y]JP2000143509 (NISSHO KK); | [Y]JP2001328934 (NIPRO CORP); | [Y]JP2007137836 (AJINOMOTO KK) | by applicant | JPS6320550B | JPS63309263 | JPH024671 | JPH055138U | JP2003095937 | JP2004189677 | - JAPANESE PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (1996), vol. 24, no. 10, page 2151 |