EP2649944 - ULTRASOUND DIAGNOSIS APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2016/45] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Hitachi Medical Corporation 4-14-1, Sotokanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TABARU Marie c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th floor Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
AZUMA Takashi c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th floor Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIKAWA Hideki c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th floor Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
HASHIBA Kunio c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th floor Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11846461.9 | 01.12.2011 | WO2011JP77853 | Priority number, date | JP20100273565 | 08.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010273565 | [2013/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012077579 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2649944 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, G01S7/52 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
A61B8/485 (EP,US);
G01S7/52049 (EP,US);
A61B8/0825 (EP,US);
A61B8/0891 (EP,US);
G01S7/52071 (EP,US);
G01S7/52073 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/42] | A61B8/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLDIAGNOSEVORRICHTUNG | [2013/42] | English: | ULTRASOUND DIAGNOSIS APPARATUS | [2013/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC PAR ULTRASONS | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2013 | Translation filed | 08.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 24.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2008249408 (PALMERI MARK L [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,7-11,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0123] * * figures 1-4,7-8 * [A] 2,5,6,12 [I] 4,14; | [XAY]US5810731 (SARVAZYAN ARMEN P [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,7-11,13,15 * abstract * * column 4, line 64 - column 8, line 13 * * figures 1-4,6-7 * [A] 2,5,6,12 [Y] 4,14; | [XAY]US2010286516 (FAN LIEXIANG [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,7-11,13,15 * the whole document * [A] 2,5,6,12 [Y] 4,14; | [YD] - DEFFIEUX T ET AL, "Shear Wave Spectroscopy for In Vivo Quantification of Human Soft Tissues Visco-Elasticity", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090301), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 313 - 322, XP011247217 [YD] 4,14 * abstract * * page 315, paragraph B. Estimation of the Phase Velocity Dispersion - page 317 * | [A] - MARIE TABARU ET AL, "Measurement of Elastic Properties of Tissue by Shear Wave Propagation Generated by Acoustic Radiation Force", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (20100701), vol. 49, no. 7, doi:10.1143/JJAP.49.07HF09, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 07HF01 - 07HF09, XP055186125 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.49.07HF09 | [A] - SHIGAO CHEN ET AL, "Shearwave dispersion ultrasound vibrometry (SDUV) for measuring tissue elasticity and viscosity", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, IEEE, US, (20090101), vol. 56, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TUFFC.2009.1005, ISSN 0885-3010, pages 55 - 62, XP011267403 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 56 - page 59 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TUFFC.2009.1005 | International search | [Y]JP2003530941 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.); | [Y]JP2010259806 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS USA, INC.); | [Y]JP2010069295 (GENERAL ELECTRIC CO.); | [Y]JP2002538911 (SOCIETE D'ELASTOGRAPHIE IMPULSIONNELLE POUR LES SYSTEMES DE MESURE DE); | [A]US2008249408 (MARK L. PALMERI); | [A]US2010286520 (CHRISTOPHER ROBERT HAZARD); | [A]JP2008534198 (CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE); | [A]US2004068184 (GREGG E. TRAHEY); | [A]JP2010172699 (GENERAL ELECTRIC CO.) | [A] - MARIE TABARU ET AL., "Choonpa Hosharyoku ni yoru Danseiritsu Keisoku", REPORT OF THE 2010 SPRING MEETING, (201003), pages 1279 - 1280, XP008172083 |