EP2650901 - CHARGED PARTICLE BEAM APPARATUS AND METHOD OF IRRADIATING CHARGED PARTICLE BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14, Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMAGUCHI, Tsunenori c/o Naka Division Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 882 Oaza Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | 02 /
SEKIHARA, Isamu c/o Naka Division Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 882 Oaza Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | 03 /
AGEMURA, Toshihide c/o Naka Division Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 882 Oaza Ichige Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8504 / JP | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11847394.1 | 30.11.2011 | WO2011JP77670 | Priority number, date | JP20100271806 | 06.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010271806 | [2013/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012077554 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2650901 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/147, H01J37/317 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
H01J37/147 (EP,US);
H01J29/70 (EP,US);
H01J37/023 (EP,US);
H01J37/317 (EP,US);
H01J2237/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR GELADENE PARTIKELSTRAHLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSSTRAHLUNG GELADENER PARTIKELSTRAHLEN | [2013/42] | English: | CHARGED PARTICLE BEAM APPARATUS AND METHOD OF IRRADIATING CHARGED PARTICLE BEAM | [2013/42] | French: | APPAREIL À FAISCEAU DE PARTICULES CHARGÉES ET PROCÉDÉ D'IRRADIATION DE FAISCEAU DE PARTICULES CHARGÉES | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2013 | Translation filed | 08.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 18.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH03101849U (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH085528 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2002117796 (JEOL LTD); | [A]JP2002148159 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JP2003513419 (VARIAN SEMICONDUCTOR EQUIPMENT ASSOCIATES, INC.); | [X]JP2003528659 (GSI GESELLSCHAFT FUER SCHWERIONENFORSCHUNG MBH); | [A]JP2004362829 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP); | [A]JP2006032154 (NOGUCHI HIROYUKI, et al); | [XP]JP2011146690 (CANON ANELVA CORP) | by applicant | JPH085528 | JP2002148159 | JP2002277364 | JP2004264145 | JP2007193977 |