EP2650005 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING FERMENTED TEA EXTRACTS FOR REDUCING LIPID LEVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amorepacific Corporation 181, Hangang-ro 2-ga Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-777 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Amorepacific Corporation 181, 2-ga Hangang-ro Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-777 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Su Kyung 202-1602 Ehwa Apt. 104-20 Ojeon-dong Uiwang-si Gyeonggi-do 437-070 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Hyun Jung 200-14 Doksan 4-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-014 / KR | 03 /
RHA, Chan Su 2003-1804 Baekhyeonmaeul Lotte Castle Apt. Jung-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-791 / KR | 04 /
OH, Yu Jin 113-203 whitevill Gumi-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-845 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Bum Jin 602-902 Songpa Pine Town Apt. Jangji-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-943 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Chae Wook 101-1703 Hyundai Morningside Apt. Bora-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-583 / KR | 07 /
SEO, Dae Bang 308-1503 Geumhwamaeul Jugong Apt. Sanggal-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-760 / KR | 08 /
CHUNG, Jin Oh 202-702 Hansolmaeul LG Apt. Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-909 / KR | 09 /
LEE, Sang Jun 205-702 Hansolmaeul LG Apt. Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-909 / KR | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Route de Florissant 10 Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [2013/42] | Application number, filing date | 11847685.2 | 09.12.2011 | WO2011KR09502 | Priority number, date | KR20100125468 | 09.12.2010 Original published format: KR 20100125468 | [2013/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012078004 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2650005 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/82, A61P3/04, A61P3/00 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
A61K36/82 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT FERMENTIERTEN TEE-EXTRAKTEN ZUR LIPIDSPIEGELREDUZIERUNG | [2013/42] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING FERMENTED TEA EXTRACTS FOR REDUCING LIPID LEVEL | [2013/42] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DES EXTRAITS DE THÉ FERMENTÉ ET DESTINÉE À FAIRE BAISSER LE TAUX DE LIPIDES | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2013 | Translation filed | 21.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 07.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.05.2017 | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/39] | 16.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.05.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20020010443 (KIM JEONG KYU [KR]) [X] 1-4,9 * the whole document *; | [X]KR20060022117 (KIM DONG WON [KR]) [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007036874 (ZHONG LITAO [US]) [Y] 1-9* the whole document *; | [Y]JP2007228964 (NAGASAKI PREFECTURE, et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]KR20080005037 (UNIV SUNCHON NAT IND ACAD COOP [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2010062106 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2010131910 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2011046392 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR], et al) [XP] 1-7,9 * page 6 - page 7 * * example 1 *; | [Y] - IWAI K ET AL, "ANTIOXIDATIVE FUNCTIONS OF NATTO, A KIND OF FERMENTED SOYBEANS: EFFECT ON LDL OXIDATION AND LIPID METABOLISM IN CHOLESTEROL-FED RATS", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20020101), vol. 50, no. 12, doi:10.1021/JF0117199, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 3597 - 3601, XP001156978 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf0117199 | [Y] - T. YOKOTA ET AL, "The Effect of Antioxidant-containing Fraction from Fermented Soybean Food on Atherosclerosis Development in Cholesterol-fed Rabbits", LWT - FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (19961201), vol. 29, no. 8, doi:10.1006/fstl.1996.0117, ISSN 0023-6438, pages 751 - 755, XP055110925 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/fstl.1996.0117 | International search | [A]US2009170185 (HAYAKAWA HIROKO [JP], et al); | [Y]KR20100091393 (IND ACADEMIC COOP [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20100122296 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20100124519 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]); | [A] - J.-K. LIN ET AL., "Mechanisms of hypolipidemic and anti-obesity effects of tea and tea polyphenols", MOLECULAR NUTRITION & FOOD RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 50, pages 211 - 217, XP009152926 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mnfr.200500138 | [A] - PV A. BABU ET AL., "Green tea extract impedes dyslipidemia and development of cardiac dysfunction in streptozotocin-diabetic rats", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL PHARMACOLOGY AND PHYSIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 33, pages 1184 - 1189, XP055110887 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1440-1681.2006.04509.x |