EP2649447 - SAMPLE ANALYSIS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akonni Biosystems 400 Sagner Avenue, Suite 300 Frederick, MD 21701 / US | [2013/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COONEY, Christopher 7991 Heather Mist Drive Severn, MD 21144 / US | 02 /
BELGRADER, Phillip 89 Robinson Landing Road Sevema Park, MD 21146 / US | 03 /
BUENO, Arial 1703 Algonquin Road Frederick, MD 21701 / US | 04 /
GARBER, Steve 9539 Clocktowner Lane Columbia, MD 21046 / US | 05 /
THAKORE, Nitu, Harshendu 8419 Downey Dale Drive Randallstown, MD 21133 / US | 06 /
QU, Peter, Qiang 11327 Country Club Road New Market, MD 21774 / US | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Rees, Kerry WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11847744.7 | 08.12.2011 | WO2011US63937 | Priority number, date | US20100421414P | 09.12.2010 Original published format: US 421414 P | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012078863 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2649447 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.09.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/48, G01N35/08, B01L3/00, B01L7/00 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
B01L3/5025 (EP,CN,US);
B01L3/50855 (EP,CN,US);
B01L7/52 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2200/04 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2200/0678 (EP,US);
B01L2200/16 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/044 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0672 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP);
B01L2300/0819 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/087 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2400/065 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/42] | G01N33/53, G01N33/48, G01N35/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Title | German: | PROBENANALYSESYSTEM | [2013/42] | English: | SAMPLE ANALYSIS SYSTEM | [2013/42] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANALYSE D'ÉCHANTILLON | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 14.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006246490 (ANDERSON ROLFE C [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0074] - [0422]; figure 12 * [I] 3-11; | [A]US2010144558 (ZENHAUSERN FREDERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XI]US2010291668 (BERTRAND JEFF [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0026] - [0052]; figures 1,2a * [I] 2-11 | International search | [A]US2010284859 (COONEY CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al); | [A]WO2009136892 (AKONNI BIOSYSTEMS [US], et al); | [A]US2009111193 (COONEY CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al); | [A]US2010015646 (JOHNSON BRANDON T [US], et al); | [A]US5388614 (HAKAMADA NAOKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2003175820 (SMITH DAVE [US], et al) |