EP2652183 - METHOD OF FORMING A NANO-ENGINEERED ULTRA-CONDUCTIVE NANOCOMPOSITE COPPER WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/43] | NANO-ENGINEERED ULTRA-CONDUCTIVE NANOCOMPOSITE COPPER WIRE | ||
[2018/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cleveland State University 2121 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAYFEH, Taysir, H. 10219 Edgewater Drive Cleveland OH 44102 / US | 02 /
WIEDERHOLT, Anita, M. 5368 Apple Creek Drive Sheffield Village OH 44054 / US | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/43] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11848319.7 | 15.12.2011 | [2018/27] | WO2011US65191 | Priority number, date | US201061424218P | 17.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061424218 P | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012083036 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2652183 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2652183 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B22D19/02, B22D17/04, B21C23/00, B21C37/04, D01F9/12, B21C1/00, B22D19/14, C22C47/12, B02C7/16, B22D17/14, B22D27/15, B22F5/12, B82Y30/00, C22C1/10, C01B32/16, C01B32/172 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
B22D17/14 (EP,US);
B02C7/16 (EP,US);
B21C1/003 (EP,US);
B21C37/045 (EP,US);
B21C37/047 (EP,US);
B22D17/04 (EP,US);
B22D19/02 (EP,US);
B22D27/15 (EP,US);
B22F5/12 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/16 (EP,US);
C01B32/172 (EP,US);
C22C1/101 (EP,US);
C22C1/1015 (EP,US);
C22C1/1036 (EP,US);
C22C1/1073 (EP,US);
C22C47/12 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, C22C2026/002 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10, B22F5/12, B22F3/17 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2018/06] | B22D19/02, B22D17/04, B21C23/00, B21C37/04, D01F9/12, B82B1/00, B21C1/00, B22D19/14, C22C47/12, B02C7/16, B22D17/14, B22D27/15, B22F5/12, B82Y30/00, C22C1/10, C01B32/16, C01B32/172 | ||
Former IPC [2017/14] | B22D19/02, B22D17/04, B21C23/00, B21C37/04, D01F9/12, B82B1/00, B21C1/00, B22D19/14, C22C47/12, B02C7/16, B22D17/14, B22D27/15, B22F5/12, B82Y30/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/43] | D01F9/12, B82B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NANOSTRUKTURIERTER ULTRALEITFÄHIGER NANOKOMPOSIT-KUPFERDRAHT | [2018/07] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING A NANO-ENGINEERED ULTRA-CONDUCTIVE NANOCOMPOSITE COPPER WIRE | [2018/07] | French: | PORCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE FIL DE CUIVRE À NANO-COMPOSITES ULTRA-CONDUCTEUR NANO-USINÉ | [2018/07] |
Former [2013/43] | NANOSTRUKTURIERTER ULTRALEITFÄHIGER NANOKOMPOSIT-KUPFERDRAHT | ||
Former [2013/43] | NANO-ENGINEERED ULTRA-CONDUCTIVE NANOCOMPOSITE COPPER WIRE | ||
Former [2013/43] | FIL DE CUIVRE À NANO-COMPOSITES ULTRA-CONDUCTEUR NANO-USINÉ | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 22.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2011 | AL | 04.07.2018 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | IT | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | PT | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | IE | 15.12.2018 | LU | 15.12.2018 | MT | 15.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
MT | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
MT | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
MT | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
MT | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2018024 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1-15 * page 6, paragraph 1; figure - * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US5259436 (YUN DAVID I [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * claim - *; | [A]US2008210370 (SMALLEY RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 7,15* claims 64, 74 *; | [A]US2010203351 (NAYFEH TAYSIR H [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 6] , [0 35]; figures 4, 14, 21 * | International search | [Y]US5259436 (YUN DAVID I [US], et al); | [Y]US6021840 (COLVIN GREGORY N [US]); | [Y]US2005115693 (BAUMGARTNER DOMINIK [CH]); | [Y]US2008067681 (TSENG TZU-CHUN [TW], et al); | [Y]US2008210370 (SMALLEY RICHARD E [US], et al); | [Y]US2010068526 (ADAMS HORST [CH], et al); | [Y]US2010203351 (NAYFEH TAYSIR H [US]); | [YP]US2011068299 (HONG SOON-HYUNG [KR], et al); | [YP]US2011174519 (SHAH TUSHAR K [US], et al) |