EP2654077 - CERAMIC VIA SUBSTRATE, METALLIZED CERAMIC VIA SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BOTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-8648 / JP | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Naoto c/o TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Yasuyuki c/o TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2013/43] | Selden, Deborah Anne Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11849004.4 | 02.12.2011 | WO2011JP77966 | Priority number, date | JP20100276882 | 13.12.2010 Original published format: JP 2010276882 | [2013/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012081425 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2654077 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/12, H01L23/15, H05K1/09, H05K1/11, H05K3/40 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
H01L23/15 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/0306 (US);
H01L23/49827 (EP,US);
H05K3/0094 (US);
H05K3/4061 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
H05K1/092 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1476 (EP,US);
H05K3/245 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Title | German: | KERAMIKDURCHGANGSSUBSTRAT, METALLISIERTES KERAMIKDURCHGANGSSUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BEIDEM | [2013/43] | English: | CERAMIC VIA SUBSTRATE, METALLIZED CERAMIC VIA SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING BOTH | [2013/43] | French: | SUBSTRAT CÉRAMIQUE À TROUS DE LIAISON, SUBSTRAT CÉRAMIQUE À TROUS DE LIAISON MÉTALLISÉS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CES SUBSTRATS | [2013/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2013 | Translation filed | 20.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 10.07.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2008071843 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO); | [X]JP2002016329 (KYOCERA CORP); | [X]JP2001320172 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2006196810 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JP2006066752 (KYOCERA CORP) | by applicant | US2004359693 |