EP2651255 - PROCESS OF PREPARING PRINTING SOLUTION AND MAKING PATTERNED CIGARETTE WRAPPERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altria Client Services LLC 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, Virginia 23230 / US | [2016/26] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Altria Client Services Inc. 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, VA 23230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERWOOD, Timothy S. 11506 Courthouse Acres Drive Midlothian, Virginia 23113 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Robert N. 3724 Heverley Drive Glen Allen, Virginia 23059 / US | 03 /
ROSE, Marc W. 10273 Brickerton Drive Mechanicsville Virginia 23116 / US | [2013/49] |
Former [2013/43] | 01 /
SHERWOOD, Timothy S. 11506 Courthouse Acres Drive Midlothian Virginia 23113 / US | ||
02 /
SMITH, Robert N. 3724 Heverley Drive Glen Allen Virginia 23059 / US | |||
03 /
ROSE, Marc W. 10273 Brickerton Drive Mechanicsville Virginia 23116 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2017/46] |
Former [2013/43] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11849346.9 | 13.12.2011 | [2017/46] | WO2011US64676 | Priority number, date | US20100422525P | 13.12.2010 Original published format: US 422525 P | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012082757 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2651255 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2651255 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/24, A24D1/02, D21H27/22, D21H19/14, B41M3/00, C09D11/03, C09D11/14 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
B41M3/006 (EP,US);
A24C5/24 (KR);
A24D1/02 (KR);
A24D1/025 (EP,US);
A24D3/18 (KR);
B41F31/00 (KR);
C09D103/00 (KR);
C09D11/03 (EP,US);
C09D11/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/49] | A24C5/24 | ||
Former IPC [2013/43] | A24D3/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DRUCKLÖSUNG UND ZUR PRODUKTION GEMUSTERTER ZIGARETTENUMHÜLLUNGEN | [2013/43] | English: | PROCESS OF PREPARING PRINTING SOLUTION AND MAKING PATTERNED CIGARETTE WRAPPERS | [2013/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE SOLUTION D'IMPRESSION ET DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER À CIGARETTE À MOTIFS | [2013/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 21.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 05.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17197328.2 / EP3287016 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2011 | AL | 15.11.2017 | AT | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | DK | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | ES | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | IT | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | MK | 15.11.2017 | NL | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | RS | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | SM | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | IE | 13.12.2017 | LU | 13.12.2017 | MT | 13.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | NO | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.12.2011 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008146159 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1-25 * page 25, lines 30-36 * * pages 18-19; tables I, II * * page 24, lines 25-29 * * page 47, line 22 - page 48, line 25 * * page 51, lines 10-29 * * page 52, lines 4-16 * * page 58, lines 28-37 * * claims 28,34,52 *; | [XI]WO2009004482 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 18 * claims 1, 2, 8 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * [I] 1-25; | [X]US2005186257 (MANEGOLD TODD [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-13,16,17,22,24 * page 5; example 1 * * claims 1, 10 * * claims 1,10 *; | [E]WO2012158786 (ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES INC [US], et al) [E] 18 * claims 1, 4, 5, 12, 13, 21 * | International search | [X]US2008295854 (LI PING [US], et al); | [A]US2007102017 (SHERWOOD TIMOTHY S [US], et al) | by applicant | US2008295854 | US20090064439 |