EP2656299 - DYNAMIC CONTENT INSERTION USING CONTENT SIGNATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARROLL, John W. 965 North Nielson Street Gilbert, Arizona 85234 / US | 02 /
TRAW, C. Brendan 8224 NW Skyline Blvd Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11850964.5 | 21.12.2011 | WO2011US66577 | Priority number, date | US20100978196 | 23.12.2010 Original published format: US 978196 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012088308 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2656299 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.10.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q50/10 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0251 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06F21/16 (KR);
G06Q30/0277 (KR);
H04N21/83 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | G06Q50/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE INHALTSEINFÜGUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON INHALTSSIGNATUREN | [2013/44] | English: | DYNAMIC CONTENT INSERTION USING CONTENT SIGNATURES | [2013/44] | French: | INSERTION DE CONTENU DYNAMIQUE À L'AIDE DE SIGNATURES DE CONTENU | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 19.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2010205628 (DAVIS BRUCE L [US], et al); | [Y]US2010049612 (MORIMOTO NORISHIGE [JP], et al); | [Y]US2010318428 (BIRCH JAMES R [US]); | [A]KR20100101397 (KIM TAE KYU [KR], et al) |