EP2655885 - FLUID DELIVERY DEVICE IDENTIFICATION AND LOADING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICU Medical, Inc. 951 Calle Amanecer San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2019/35] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states ICU Medical, Inc. 951 Calle Amanecer San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | ||
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Hospira, Inc. Dept. NLEG, H1 275 North Field Drive Lake Forest, IL 60045-2579 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOY, Yei F. 352 Thompson Blvd. Buffalo Grove, Illinois 60089-1031 / US | 02 /
ZIEGLER, John S. 806 S. Mitchell Avenue Arlington Heights, Illinois 60005 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Invent Horizon IP Nordenskiöldsgatan 11A 211 19 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/35] | Invent Horizon IP Barometergatan 16B 211 17 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2013/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11851186.4 | 22.12.2011 | [2019/35] | WO2011US66808 | Priority number, date | US201061426348P | 22.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061426348 P | US201113333228 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: US201113333228 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012088401 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2655885 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2655885 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/08, F04B43/12 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
F04B43/08 (EP,US);
F04B43/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND BELADUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2013/44] | English: | FLUID DELIVERY DEVICE IDENTIFICATION AND LOADING SYSTEM | [2013/44] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE CHARGEMENT DE DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 25.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2019 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2011 | AL | 28.08.2019 | AT | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | CZ | 28.08.2019 | DK | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | FI | 28.08.2019 | HR | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | NL | 28.08.2019 | PL | 28.08.2019 | RO | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SE | 28.08.2019 | SI | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | NO | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IE | 22.12.2019 | LU | 22.12.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | PT | 30.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.12.2011 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
NO | 28.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4735558 (KIENHOLZ CHARLES M [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 49; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]US4842584 (PASTRONE JOHN [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 31; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US4927411 (PASTRONE JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 40; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US5601420 (WARNER ERIC A [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 42; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0891784 (BAXTER INT [US]) [A] 1,13,14* page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 45; figure 16 *; | [XI]US2010094224 (FATHALLAH MARWAN A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13,14 * paragraph [0071]; figure 9 * [I] 6-12 | International search | [Y]US4513885 (HOGAN LAWRENCE R [US]); | [Y]US5098262 (WECKER SHELDON M [US], et al); | [Y]US5138743 (HOFFMAN CHARLES J [US]); | [Y]US6325264 (OMOSAKO TORU [JP]); | [Y]US2010094224 (FATHALLAH MARWAN A [US], et al) | by applicant | US4735558 | US4842584 | US4927411 | US5601420 |